This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:02:58 (UTC).

Chewy, Inc. v. WordLogic Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Chewy, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against WordLogic Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph C. Spero and James Donato. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-07953

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Joseph C. Spero

James Donato

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chewy, Inc.

Defendants

WordLogic Corporation

602531 British Columbia Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicholas A. Brown

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

4 Embarcadero Center, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94111-5983

Joshua L. Raskin

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Metlife Building, 200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal - Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Chewy, Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/14/2020) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

18 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#18

(#18) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 01/08/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2020) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#17

(#17) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#16

(#16) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Chewy, Inc... (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#15

(#15) EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint, Exhibit 4 filed byChewy, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/24/2019) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

#14

(#14) EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint, Exhibit 3 filed byChewy, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/24/2019) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

#13

(#13) EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint, Exhibit 2 filed byChewy, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/24/2019) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

#12

(#12) EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint, Exhibit 1 filed byChewy, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/24/2019) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

#11

(#11) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 1/6/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2019) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chewy, Inc. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/10/2019) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

9 #1

Complaint

#9

(#9) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent Infringement. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to WordLogic Corporation. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to 602531 British Columbia Ltd.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/28/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/6/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment of Non-Infringement; Demand for Jury Trial against WorldLogic Corporation, 602531 British Columbia Ltd. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13949036.). Filed by Chewy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/4/2019) Modified on 12/5/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal - Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Chewy, Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/14/2020) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 01/08/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2020) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Chewy, Inc... (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint, Exhibit 4 filed byChewy, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/24/2019) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint, Exhibit 3 filed byChewy, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/24/2019) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint, Exhibit 2 filed byChewy, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/24/2019) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint, Exhibit 1 filed byChewy, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/24/2019) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 1/6/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2019) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chewy, Inc. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/10/2019) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent Infringement. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to WordLogic Corporation. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to 602531 British Columbia Ltd.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/28/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/6/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chewy, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Petsmart, Inc. for Chewy, Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/4/2019) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/18/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/4/2019) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/4/2019) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment of Non-Infringement; Demand for Jury Trial against WorldLogic Corporation, 602531 British Columbia Ltd. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13949036.). Filed by Chewy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/4/2019) Modified on 12/5/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less