This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 07:38:20 (UTC).

Chevron Environmental Management Company et al v. Environmental Protection Corporation

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 Chevron Environmental Management Company filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Environmental Protection Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lawrence J. O'Neill and Jennifer L. Thurston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00807

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lawrence J. O'Neill

Referral Judge

Jennifer L. Thurston

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Chevron U.S.A. Inc.

Chevron Environmental Management Company

Defendant

Environmental Protection Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel Ernest Vineyard

Attorney at Jackson Walker L.L.P.

1401 Mckinney St., Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77010

Lindsey C. Moorhead, PHV

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP

1401 Mckinney Street, Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77010

Christopher A. Thompson, PHV

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP

2323 Ross Avenue, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75201

William A.I. McDonald, PHV

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP

1401 Mckinney, Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

15 #2

Declaration of William A.I. McDonald, III in Support of Motion for Clerk's

15 #3

Proposed Order Granting the Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default and Motion

#15

(#15) MOTION for DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/19/2019 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of William A.I. McDonald, III in Support of Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default and Motion for Default Judgment, #3 Proposed Order Granting the Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default and Motion for Default Judgment)(Vineyard, Daniel) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#16

(#16) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Environmental Protection Corporation.* (Hall, S) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

15 #1

Exhibit A

13 #1

Notice Certificate of Good Standing

#14

(#14) ORDER GRANTING #13 PRO HAC VICE Application of Attorney Lindsey C. Moorhead, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/3/2019. Attorney Lindsey C. Moorhead added for Chevron Environmental Management Company and Chevron U.S.A. Inc. (Hall, S) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#13

(#13) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron U.S.A. Inc. for attorney Lindsey C. Moorhead to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8339952) (Attachments: #1 Notice Certificate of Good Standing)(Vineyard, Daniel) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Environmental Protection Corporation served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Vineyard, Daniel) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER GRANTING #8 PRO HAC VICE Application of Attorney William A.I. McDonald for Chevron Environmental Management Company and Chevron U.S.A. Inc., signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/24/2019. (Hall, S) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

8 #1

Notice Certificate of Good Standing

#8

(#8) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron U.S.A. Inc. for attorney William A.I. "Trey" McDonald III to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8324794) (Attachments: #1 Notice Certificate of Good Standing)(Vineyard, Daniel) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

9 #1

Notice Certificate of Good Standing

#9

(#9) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron U.S.A. Inc. for attorney Christopher A. Thompson to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8324939) (Attachments: #1 Notice Certificate of Good Standing)(Vineyard, Daniel) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER GRANTING #9 PRO HAC VICE Application of Attorney Christopher A. Thompson for Chevron Environmental Management Company and Chevron U.S.A. Inc., signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/24/2019. (Hall, S) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

7 #4

VDRP

7 #2

JLT Worksheet

#7

(#7) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2019 at 08:45 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 JLT Worksheet, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ENTRY ONLY), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/22/2019: In light of the entry of default (Doc. #16 ) as to defendant, the Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2019 is VACATED. Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment (Doc. #15 ) is denied as moot, and plaintiff SHALL file a noticed motion for default judgment, supported by evidence, no later than 8/21/2019. (Hall, S) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Environmental Protection Corporation.* (Hall, S) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION for DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/19/2019 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of William A.I. McDonald, III in Support of Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default and Motion for Default Judgment, #3 Proposed Order Granting the Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default and Motion for Default Judgment)(Vineyard, Daniel) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER GRANTING #13 PRO HAC VICE Application of Attorney Lindsey C. Moorhead, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/3/2019. Attorney Lindsey C. Moorhead added for Chevron Environmental Management Company and Chevron U.S.A. Inc. (Hall, S) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron U.S.A. Inc. for attorney Lindsey C. Moorhead to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8339952) (Attachments: #1 Notice Certificate of Good Standing)(Vineyard, Daniel) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Environmental Protection Corporation served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Vineyard, Daniel) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER GRANTING #8 PRO HAC VICE Application of Attorney William A.I. McDonald for Chevron Environmental Management Company and Chevron U.S.A. Inc., signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/24/2019. (Hall, S) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER GRANTING #9 PRO HAC VICE Application of Attorney Christopher A. Thompson for Chevron Environmental Management Company and Chevron U.S.A. Inc., signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/24/2019. (Hall, S) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron U.S.A. Inc. for attorney Christopher A. Thompson to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8324939) (Attachments: #1 Notice Certificate of Good Standing)(Vineyard, Daniel) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron U.S.A. Inc. for attorney William A.I. "Trey" McDonald III to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8324794) (Attachments: #1 Notice Certificate of Good Standing)(Vineyard, Daniel) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2019 at 08:45 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 JLT Worksheet, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Environmental Protection Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel Ernest Vineyard* *1401 McKinney St.* *Suite 1900* *Houston, TX 77010*. (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Chevron Environmental Management Company, Chevron U.S.A. Inc. (Vineyard, Daniel) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • (#4) CLERK'S NOTICE of DOCKET CORRECTION: Civil Cover Sheet. Under Local Rule 3-200, every complaint, amended complaint, or other document initiating a civil action shall be accompanied by acompleted civil cover sheet, on a form available from the Clerk and on the Court's website. Please file your civil cover sheet. If youneed assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of RELATED CASE 1:11-cv-01396-LJO-BAM by Chevron Environmental Management Company, a California corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., a Pennsylvania corporation. (Vineyard, Daniel) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiffs Chevron Environmental Management Company, a California corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., a Pennsylvania corporation. (Vineyard, Daniel) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs by Chevron Environmental Management Company, a California corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., a Pennsylvania corporation. Attorney Vineyard, Daniel Ernest added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8301826) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Vineyard, Daniel) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.