This case was last updated from PACER on 08/16/2019 07:52:02

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/17/2019 a Prisoner - Other Prisoner case was filed by Chestnut against Lue in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Virginia Western District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 7:19-CV-00455
  • Filing Date 06/17/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Prisoner - Other Prisoner
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge Robert S. Ballou
  • Courthouse Virginia Western District

Party Details

  • Respondent D. Lue
  • Represented By
    • Justin Michael Lugar
  • Petitioner Raymond Edward Chestnut
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented

Court Documents

9 #8

Attachment G

Fees Apply
9 #7

Attachment F

Fees Apply
9 #6

Attachment E

Fees Apply
9 #5

Attachment D

Fees Apply
9 #4

Attachment C

Fees Apply
9 #3

Attachment B

Fees Apply
9 #2

Attachment A

Fees Apply
9 #11

Attachment J

Fees Apply
9 #10

Attachment I

Fees Apply
9 #1

Exhibit 1

Fees Apply
#10

(#10) Roseboro Notice re #8 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alte...

Fees Apply
#8

(#8) MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, MOTION for Sum...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2019
  • (#10) Roseboro Notice re #8 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment Deadline set for 8/30/2019. (slt)
  • 08/05/2019
  • (#9) Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by D. Lue. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Attachment A, #3 Attachment B, #4 Attachment C, #5 Attachment D, #6 Attachment E, #7 Attachment F, #8 Attachment G, #9 Attachment H, #10 Attachment I, #11 Attachment J)(Lugar, Justin)
  • 08/05/2019
  • (#8) MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment by D. Lue. (Lugar, Justin)
  • 08/02/2019
  • (#7) Pursuant to STANDING ORDER 2019-5, the U.S. Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe is referred to this case. Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou no longer assigned to the case. Motions referred to Joel C. Hoppe. (slt)
  • 06/27/2019
  • (#6) Order of Service pursuant to Section 28 U.S.C. 2241 upon respondents re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, and denying #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 6/27/2019. (slt)
  • 06/17/2019
  • (#5) Consent to Fee by Petitioner Raymond Edward Chestnut (tvt)
  • 06/17/2019
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Raymond Edward Chestnut. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (tvt)
  • 06/17/2019
  • (#3) Statement of Assets by Raymond Edward Chestnut (tvt)
  • 06/17/2019
  • (#2) MOTION to Expedite by Raymond Edward Chestnut. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (tvt)
  • 06/17/2019
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by Raymond Edward Chestnut. (Note: no copy of petition or self addressed envelope enclosed as stated by petitioner) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B, #2 Cover Letter)(tvt)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.