This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/14/2022 at 09:24:57 (UTC).

Chester v. Bybee et al

Case Summary

On 12/16/2021 Chester filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Bybee. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is James E. Shadid. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01368

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James E. Shadid

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Darryl Chester

Canton, IL 61520

Defendants

Derrick Bybee

. Joachim

. Johnson

. Adams

. Ellinger

. Marter

. Martindale

. Holt

. Thompson

. Jump

. Hinthorne

Tiffanie Clark

Tracy Bordner

. Rivera

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibits

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Notice Regarding Privacy Issues

#3

(#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Darryl Chester.(KE) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Darryl Chester. Responses due by 12/30/2021 (KE) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#6

(#6) Letter from Clerk of the Court to Lawrence Correctional Center requesting Trust Fund Ledgers. (KE) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) Exhibit re #1 Complaint by Darryl Chester. (KE) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#9

(#9) Additional Exhibits re #1 Complaint by Darryl Chester. (KE) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#10

(#10) Additional Exhibits re #1 Complaint by Darryl Chester. (KE) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#11

(#11) Additional Exhibit re #1 Complaint by Darryl Chester. (KE) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#12

(#12) Additonal Exhibits re #1 Complaint by Darryl Chester. (KE) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Additonal Exhibits re #1 Complaint by Darryl Chester. (KE) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Additional Exhibit re #1 Complaint by Darryl Chester. (KE) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Additional Exhibits re #1 Complaint by Darryl Chester. (KE) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Additional Exhibits re #1 Complaint by Darryl Chester. (KE) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketPrisoner Initial Partial Filing Fee received 1/5/2022, in the amount of $ 367.00; receipt number 24626010382 (JMB) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Exhibit re #1 Complaint by Darryl Chester. (KE) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketPrisoner Initial Partial Filing Fee received 1/5/2022 in the amount of $ 35.00; receipt number 14626042240. (AH) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 12/21/2021. The Court DENIES Plaintiff's Petition for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ("IFP") #3 . Plaintiff's trust fund ledger #4 shows that he transferred with an $831 balance. From September to December 2021, Plaintiff received an additional $239 and spent $636 on commissary items, pen-pals, postage, and library fees during that time. Six days before Plaintiff filed suit, his trust fund balance was $433.02, which Plaintiff acknowledges on his IFP petition. "A litigant wishing to proceed in forma pauperis must show that he is unable to pay required filing fees." Merritte v. Templeton, 493 F. App'x 782, 784 (7th Cir. 2012) (citing 28 U.S.C. Sec 1915(a)(1). Because Plaintiff had not shown that he is impoverished, the Court directs Plaintiff to pay the $402 filing fee in full within fourteen days of the entry of this order. (KE) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Darryl Chester. (KE) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter from Clerk of the Court to Lawrence Correctional Center requesting Trust Fund Ledgers. (KE) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Darryl Chester. Responses due by 12/30/2021 (KE) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Darryl Chester. (KE) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Darryl Chester.(KE) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge James Shadid. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 1/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Darryl Chester. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(KE) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARTINDALE LTD. DBA PLANTATION PLACE APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases where Holt is a litigant

Latest cases where RIVERA AKA GERARDO C is a litigant

Latest cases where Adams is a litigant