This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 07:29:36 (UTC).

Chesmore v. Chesmore

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 Chesmore filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Chesmore. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Jarvey and Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00020

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Jarvey

Referral Judge

Stephen B. Jackson, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ryan Chesmore

Muscatine, IA 52761

Defendant

Alice Chesmore

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) JUDGMENT entered due to lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Clerk John S. Courter on 4/10/2019. (rmj) (Main Document 4 replaced on 4/12/2019) (rmj). (Entered: 04/10/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 4/9/2019. (mem) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ryan Chesmore. (rmj) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Alice Chesmore filed by Ryan Chesmore. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 5/21/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rmj) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) JUDGMENT entered due to lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Clerk John S. Courter on 4/10/2019. (rmj) (Main Document 4 replaced on 4/12/2019) (rmj). (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 4/9/2019. (mem) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ryan Chesmore. (rmj) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Alice Chesmore filed by Ryan Chesmore. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 5/21/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rmj) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Chief Judge John A. Jarvey and Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr added. (rmj) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.