This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/28/2022 at 09:08:41 (UTC).

Chervon (HK) Limited et al v. One World Technologies, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/27/2022 Chervon HK Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against One World Technologies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles R. Norgle, Sr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00477

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Norgle, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

Chervon (HK) Limited

Chervon North America Inc.

Homelite Consumer Products, Inc.

One World Technologies, Inc.

Techtronic Industries Co. Ltd.

Petitioners

Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Keith Jarosik

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

James J. Lukas, Jr

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

77 West Wacker Drive, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60601

Benjamin Patrick Gilford

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, Llp

77 W. Wacker Drive, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60601

Defendant Attorneys

Ferlillia V. Roberson

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP US

444 West Lake Street, Suite 900

Chicago, IL 60606-0089

Stephanie Haeun Lim

Attorney at Dla Piper Llp (us)

444 West Lake Street, Suite 900

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Defendant's motion for leave to file documents under seal #10 is granted. Mailed notice (cp, ) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#11

(#11) REPLY by Movants Greenberg Traurig, LLP, Keith Jarosik in Support of Motion to Quash (Lukas, James) (Entered: 03/12/2022)

#10

(#10) MOTION by Defendants Homelite Consumer Products, Inc., One World Technologies, Inc., Techtronic Industries Co. Ltd. to seal document sealed document, #8 - Opposition To Greenberg Traurig, LLP's And Keith Jarosik's Motion To Quash And Motion For A Protective Order - (Roberson, Ferlillia) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

9 #7

Exhibit F

9 #6

Exhibit F

9 #5

*Restricted*

9 #3

Exhibit C (REDACTED)

9 #2

Exhibit B

1 #19

Exhibit 19

1 #17

Exhibit 17

1 #16

Exhibit 16

1 #11

Exhibit 11

1 #9

Exhibit 9

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) MISCELLANEOUS CASE by Greenberg Traurig, LLP, Keith Jarosik Motion to Quash Subpoenas and Motion for a Protective Order Filing fee $ 49, receipt number 0752-19097451. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lukas, James) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Defendant's motion for leave to file documents under seal #10 is granted. Mailed notice (cp, ) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPLY by Movants Greenberg Traurig, LLP, Keith Jarosik in Support of Motion to Quash (Lukas, James) (Entered: 03/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION by Defendants Homelite Consumer Products, Inc., One World Technologies, Inc., Techtronic Industries Co. Ltd. to seal document sealed document, #8 - Opposition To Greenberg Traurig, LLP's And Keith Jarosik's Motion To Quash And Motion For A Protective Order - (Roberson, Ferlillia) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Opposition To Greenberg Traurig, LLP's And Keith Jarosik's Motion To Quash And Motion For A Protective Order (REDACTED) - ECF No. #1 by Homelite Consumer Products, Inc., One World Technologies, Inc., Techtronic Industries Co. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C (REDACTED), #4 Exhibit D (REDACTED), #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit F)(Roberson, Ferlillia) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants Homelite Consumer Products, Inc., One World Technologies, Inc., Techtronic Industries Co. Ltd. - Opposition To Greenberg Traurig, LLP's And Keith Jarosik's Motion To Quash And Motion For A Protective Order - (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Roberson, Ferlillia) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AGREED ORDER GRANTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON NON-PARTIES GREENBERG, TRAURIG, LLP'S AND KEITH JAROSIK'S MOTION TO QUASH ONE WORLD TECHNOLOGIES, INC'S, TECHTRONIC INDUSTRIES CO. LTD.'S AND HOMELITE CONSUMER PRODUCTS, INC.'S SUBPOENAS AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER: Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle on 2/18/2022. Mailed notice (cp, ) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Homelite Consumer Products, Inc., One World Technologies, Inc., Techtronic Industries Co. Ltd. by Stephanie Haeun Lim (Lim, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Homelite Consumer Products, Inc., One World Technologies, Inc., Techtronic Industries Co. Ltd. by Ferlillia V. Roberson (Roberson, Ferlillia) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated. (exr, ) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (sxh, ) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (sxh, ) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Movants Greenberg Traurig, LLP, Keith Jarosik by Benjamin Patrick Gilford (Gilford, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Movants Greenberg Traurig, LLP, Keith Jarosik by James J. Lukas, Jr (Lukas, James) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Greenberg Traurig, LLP (Lukas, James) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MISCELLANEOUS CASE by Greenberg Traurig, LLP, Keith Jarosik Motion to Quash Subpoenas and Motion for a Protective Order Filing fee $ 49, receipt number 0752-19097451. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lukas, James) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOMELITE CONSUMER PRODUCTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Chervon North America Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where TECHTRONICS INDUSTRIES CO., LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP is a litigant