This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/17/2020 at 20:47:16 (UTC).

CHERRY et al v. BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A.

Case Summary

On 09/24/2019 CHERRY filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against BMO HARRIS BANK, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Matthew P. Brookman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04003

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Matthew P. Brookman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KIMBERLY L. CHERRY

PATRICK L. CHERRY

Defendant

BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rebekah L. Phillips

Attorney at MORSE & BICKEL, P.C.

320 N. Meridian Street, #600

Indianapolis, IN 46204

John Joseph Morse

Attorney at MORSE & BICKEL, P.C.

320 North Meridian Street, Suite 600

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Defendant Attorneys

Jacob V. Bradley

Attorney at QUARLES & BRADY LLP (Indianapolis)

135 N. Pennsylvania Street, Bmo Building, Suite 2400

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Lucy Renee Dollens

Attorney at QUARLES & BRADY LLP (Indianapolis)

135 N. Pennsylvania Street, Bmo Building, Suite 2400

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Jenna M. Shives

Attorney at QUARLES & BRADY LLP (Indianapolis)

135 N. Pennsylvania Street, Bmo Building, Suite 2400

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#38

(#38) NOTICE Preliminary Witness and Exhibit Lists, filed by Defendant BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A. (Bradley, Jacob) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#37

(#37) NOTICE AND ORDER - TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE set for August 7, 2020, is hereby RESCHEDULED for AUGUST 3, 2020 at 10:30 a.m., Indianapolis time (EST), before the Honorable Matthew P. Brookman, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed by counsel to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 3/4/2020.(AAS) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#36

(#36) Witness List (Preliminary), filed by Plaintiffs KIMBERLY L. CHERRY, PATRICK L. CHERRY, Exhibit List (Preliminary), filed by Plaintiffs KIMBERLY L. CHERRY, PATRICK L. CHERRY. (Morse, John) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#35

(#35) REPLY in Support of Motion re #29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A.. (Bradley, Jacob) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#34

(#34) ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/7/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/24/2021. Discovery due by 1/24/2020. Settlement Conference set for 10/7/2020 at 09:00 AM (Eastern Time) in room #316, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. Status Conference set for 8/7/2020 at 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 2/7/2020.(TMB) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

33 #1

Exhibit A

#33

(#33) RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Plaintiffs KIMBERLY L. CHERRY, PATRICK L. CHERRY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Morse, John) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

29 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#29

(#29) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bradley, Jacob) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob V. Bradley on behalf of Defendant BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A.. (Bradley, Jacob) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#6

(#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A. (JRB) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Rebekah L. Phillips on behalf of Plaintiffs KIMBERLY L. CHERRY, PATRICK L. CHERRY. (Phillips, Rebekah) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A.. (Morse, John) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John Joseph Morse on behalf of Plaintiffs KIMBERLY L. CHERRY, PATRICK L. CHERRY. (Morse, John) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to November 4, 2019 in which to #1 Complaint , filed by Defendant BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bradley, Jacob) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) NOTICE Preliminary Witness and Exhibit Lists, filed by Defendant BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A. (Bradley, Jacob) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE AND ORDER - TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE set for August 7, 2020, is hereby RESCHEDULED for AUGUST 3, 2020 at 10:30 a.m., Indianapolis time (EST), before the Honorable Matthew P. Brookman, United States Magistrate Judge. The information needed by counsel to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 3/4/2020.(AAS) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Witness List (Preliminary), filed by Plaintiffs KIMBERLY L. CHERRY, PATRICK L. CHERRY, Exhibit List (Preliminary), filed by Plaintiffs KIMBERLY L. CHERRY, PATRICK L. CHERRY. (Morse, John) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) REPLY in Support of Motion re #29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A.. (Bradley, Jacob) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/7/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/24/2021. Discovery due by 1/24/2020. Settlement Conference set for 10/7/2020 at 09:00 AM (Eastern Time) in room #316, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. Status Conference set for 8/7/2020 at 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 2/7/2020.(TMB) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Plaintiffs KIMBERLY L. CHERRY, PATRICK L. CHERRY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Morse, John) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 2/7/2020 at 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed for counsel to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 1/21/2020.(JRB) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A.. (Bradley, Jacob) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bradley, Jacob) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman: Status Conference held on 1/10/2020. Parties were represented by counsel. No further orders are entered at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. (TMB) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Lucy Renee Dollens on behalf of Defendant BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A.. (Dollens, Lucy) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to November 4, 2019 in which to #1 Complaint , filed by Defendant BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bradley, Jacob) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent BMO FINANCIAL CORP, Corporate Parent BANK OF MONTREAL, Toronto, Canada for BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A... (Bradley, Jacob) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob V. Bradley on behalf of Defendant BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A.. (Bradley, Jacob) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A. (JRB) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Rebekah L. Phillips on behalf of Plaintiffs KIMBERLY L. CHERRY, PATRICK L. CHERRY. (Phillips, Rebekah) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A.. (Morse, John) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John Joseph Morse on behalf of Plaintiffs KIMBERLY L. CHERRY, PATRICK L. CHERRY. (Morse, John) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A., filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5644524) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Morse, John) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Joseph Morse