This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2021 at 07:28:07 (UTC).

CHENYI XU et al v. US CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 CHENYI XU filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against US CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Kronstadt and Patricia Donahue. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-05563

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

Referral Judge

Patricia Donahue

 

Party Details

Petitioners

CHENYI XU

CHEN WANG

JIAN JIN

JIANFENG GAO

KAILIN LUO

KAINING YANG

MAN YANG

SHUANGJIAO HU

TIAN TAN

TING-WEI LIN

XIAONAN DING

YANG LIU

YANMING WU

YUJIE CHA

YUNYAN SHI

YUSHEN WANG

YUNYI GAO

YARUI WANG

Defendants

US CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES

TRACY RENAUD

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Robert K Lu

Attorney at Reid and Wise LLP

633 West 5Th Street 26Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by PETITIONERS XIAONAN DING, MAN YANG, CHEN WANG, YUNYI GAO, CHENYI XU, YARUI WANG, YANMING WU, YUSHEN WANG, KAINING YANG, JIAN JIN, TIAN TAN, YANG LIU, YUJIE CHA, YUNYAN SHI, SHUANGJIAO HU, JIANFENG GAO, TING-WEI LIN, KAILIN LUO, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Lu, Robert) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error, the Summons #11 was inadvertently entered twice on the docket. (yl) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Summons Issued re Petition #1 as to Defendants U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, 20 Massachusetts Ave, NW, Washington, DC 20529 TRACY RENAUD, DONNA P. CAMPAGNOLO, in her official capacity as the Director, California Service Center, USCIS; LOREN MILLER, in his official capacity as the Director, Nebraska Service Center, USCIS; and DANIEL M. RENAUD, in his official capacity as the Director, Vermont Service Center, USCIS (yl) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORRECTED 60 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendants DONNA P. CAMPAGNOLO, LOREN MILLER, DANIEL M. RENAUD, TRACY RENAUD, US CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (mrgo) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Petitioners YUJIE CHA, XIAONAN DING, YUNYI GAO, JIANFENG GAO, SHUANGJIAO HU, JIAN JIN, TING-WEI LIN, YANG LIU, KAILIN LUO, YUNYAN SHI, TIAN TAN, CHEN WANG, YARUI WANG, YUSHEN WANG, YANMING WU, CHENYI XU, KAINING YANG, MAN YANG. correcting Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #6 (Lu, Robert) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request, #7 . The following error(s) was found: Summons issued on 7/9/2021, see docket entry no. 6. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (mrgo) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 filed by PETITIONERS YUJIE CHA, XIAONAN DING, YUNYI GAO, JIANFENG GAO, SHUANGJIAO HU, JIAN JIN, TING-WEI LIN, YANG LIU, KAILIN LUO, YUNYAN SHI, TIAN TAN, CHEN WANG, YARUI WANG, YUSHEN WANG, YANMING WU, CHENYI XU, KAINING YANG, MAN YANG. (Lu, Robert) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) 60 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants DONNA P. CAMPAGNOLO, LOREN MILLER, DANIEL M. RENAUD, TRACY RENAUD, US CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (jtil) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (jtil) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by PETITIONERS YUJIE CHA, XIAONAN DING, YUNYI GAO, JIANFENG GAO, SHUANGJIAO HU, JIAN JIN, TING-WEI LIN, YANG LIU, KAILIN LUO, YUNYAN SHI, TIAN TAN, CHEN WANG, YARUI WANG, YUSHEN WANG, YANMING WU, CHENYI XU, KAINING YANG, MAN YANG. (Lu, Robert) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PETITIONERS YUJIE CHA, XIAONAN DING, YUNYI GAO, JIANFENG GAO, SHUANGJIAO HU, JIAN JIN, TING-WEI LIN, YANG LIU, KAILIN LUO, YUNYAN SHI, TIAN TAN, CHEN WANG, YARUI WANG, YUSHEN WANG, YANMING WU, CHENYI XU, KAINING YANG, MAN YANG, (Lu, Robert) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioners YUJIE CHA, XIAONAN DING, YUNYI GAO, JIANFENG GAO, SHUANGJIAO HU, JIAN JIN, TING-WEI LIN, YANG LIU, KAILIN LUO, YUNYAN SHI, TIAN TAN, CHEN WANG, YARUI WANG, YUSHEN WANG, YANMING WU, CHENYI XU, KAINING YANG, MAN YANG. (Lu, Robert) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS AND COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF Receipt No: ACACDC-31601742 - Fee: $402, filed by PETITIONERS XIAONAN DING, MAN YANG, CHEN WANG, YUNYI GAO, CHENYI XU, YARUI WANG, YANMING WU, YUSHEN WANG, KAINING YANG, JIAN JIN, TIAN TAN, YANG LIU, YUJIE CHA, YUNYAN SHI, SHUANGJIAO HU, JIANFENG GAO, TING-WEI LIN, KAILIN LUO. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF PETITIONER WANG, #2 Appendix TO DECLARATION OF WANG, #3 Declaration OF PETITIONER XU, #4 Appendix TO DECLARATION OF XU, #5 Declaration OF PETITIONER JIN, #6 Appendix TO DECLARATION OF JIN, #7 Declaration OF PETITIONER GAO, #8 Appendix TO DECLARATION OF GAO, #9 Declaration OF PETITIONER LUO, #10 Appendix TO DECLARATION OF LUO, #11 Declaration OF PETITIONER K. YANG, #12 Appendix TO DECLARATION OF K. YANG, #13 Declaration OF PETITIONER M. YANG, #14 Appendix TO DECLARATION OF M. YANG, #15 Declaration OF PETITIONER HU, #16 Appendix TO DECLARATION OF HU, #17 Declaration OF PETITIONER TAN, #18 Appendix TO DECLARATION OF TAN, #19 Declaration OF PETITIONER LIN, #20 Appendix TO DECLARATION OF LIN, #21 Declaration OF PETITIONER DING, #22 Appendix TO DECLARATION OF DING, #23 Declaration OF PETITIONER LIU, #24 Appendix TO DECLARATION OF LIU, #25 Declaration OF PETITIONER WU, #26 Appendix TO DECLARATION OF WU, #27 Declaration TO PETITIONER WANG, #28 Appendix TO DECLARATION OF WANG, #29 Declaration OF PETITIONER CHA, #30 Appendix TO DECLARATION OF CHA, #31 Declaration OF PETITIONER SHI, #32 Appendix TO DECLARATION OF SHI, #33 Declaration OF PETITIONER GAO, #34 Appendix TO DECLARATION OF GAO, #35 Declaration OF PETITIONER WANG, #36 Appendix TO DECLARATION OF WANG) (Attorney Robert K Lu added to party YUJIE CHA(pty:pet), Attorney Robert K Lu added to party XIAONAN DING(pty:pet), Attorney Robert K Lu added to party YUNYI GAO(pty:pet), Attorney Robert K Lu added to party JIANFENG GAO (pty:pet), Attorney Robert K Lu added to party SHUANGJIAO HU(pty:pet), Attorney Robert K Lu added to party JIAN JIN(pty:pet), Attorney Robert K Lu added to party TING-WEI LIN(pty:pet), Attorney Robert K Lu added to party YANG LIU(pty:pet), Attorney Robert K Lu added to party KAILIN LUO(pty:pet), Attorney Robert K Lu added to party YUNYAN SHI(pty:pet), Attorney Robert K Lu added to party TIAN TAN(pty:pet), Attorney Robert K Lu added to party CHEN WANG(pty:pet), Attorney Robert K Lu added to party YARUI WANG(pty:pet), Attorney Robert K Lu added to party YUSHEN WANG(pty:pet), Attorney Robert K Lu added to party YANMING WU(pty:pet), Attorney Robert K Lu added to party CHENYI XU(pty:pet), Attorney Robert K Lu added to party KAINING YANG(pty:pet), Attorney Robert K Lu added to party MAN YANG(pty:pet))(Lu, Robert) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US Citizenship and Immigration Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert K Lu