This case was last updated from PACER on 10/12/2019 at 07:54:15 (UTC).

Cheng v. Total System Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/13/2019 Cheng filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Total System Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01513

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shao Cheng Cheng

Defendants

Connie D. McDaniel

Sidney E. Harris

Thaddeus Arroyo

Joia M. Johnson

Richard A. Smith

John T. Turner

Total System Services, Inc.

Kriss Cloninger, III

M. Troy Woods

Walter W. Driver, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael J. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Brian E. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Shao Cheng Cheng (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS - filed with Jury Demand against Thaddeus Arroyo, Kriss Cloninger, III, Walter W. Driver, Jr, Sidney E. Harris, Joia M. Johnson, Connie D. McDaniel, Richard A. Smith, Total System Services, Inc., John T. Turner, M. Troy Woods - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2707258.) - filed by Shao Cheng Cheng. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • CASE CLOSED (ntl) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Shao Cheng Cheng (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Total System Services, Inc. on 8/13/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (mal) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS - filed with Jury Demand against Thaddeus Arroyo, Kriss Cloninger, III, Walter W. Driver, Jr, Sidney E. Harris, Joia M. Johnson, Connie D. McDaniel, Richard A. Smith, Total System Services, Inc., John T. Turner, M. Troy Woods - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2707258.) - filed by Shao Cheng Cheng. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Total System Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J. Farnan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian E. Farnan