This case was last updated from PACER on 11/18/2019 at 07:29:41 (UTC).

Chen v. Koumans et al

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 Chen filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Koumans. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Valerie E. Caproni. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-08719

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Valerie E. Caproni

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Li Chen

Defendants

Director Mark Koumans

Secretary Kevin K. McAleenan

Director David L. Roark

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dehai Zhang

Attorney at Law Office of Dehai Zhang

136-20 38Th Ave., Ste. 9G

Flushing, NY 11354

Defendant Attorney

Simon Nakajima

Attorney at DOJ-USAO

86 Chambers St

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties, that this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs or fees to any party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/07/2019) (ama) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) ORDER: granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application GRANTED. The deadline to respond is extended to April 3, 2020. The initial pretrial conference is adjourned to April 10, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. The parties' joint submission is due by April 2, 2020. SO ORDERED. Mark Koumans answer due 4/3/2020; Kevin K. McAleenan answer due 4/3/2020; David L. Roark answer due 4/3/2020. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/29/2019) (ama) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the undersigned for an Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on November 15, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, 10007. Plaintiff's counsel, or the defendant's counsel in removed cases, is responsible for distributing copies of this Notice to all parties. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 11/15/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/30/2019) (ama) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties, that this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs or fees to any party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/07/2019) (ama) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Mark Koumans, Kevin K. McAleenan, David L. Roark. (Nakajima, Simon) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 4/10/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (ama) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER: granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application GRANTED. The deadline to respond is extended to April 3, 2020. The initial pretrial conference is adjourned to April 10, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. The parties' joint submission is due by April 2, 2020. SO ORDERED. Mark Koumans answer due 4/3/2020; Kevin K. McAleenan answer due 4/3/2020; David L. Roark answer due 4/3/2020. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/29/2019) (ama) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and to adjourn conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Simon Nakajima dated October 29, 2019. Document filed by Mark Koumans, Kevin K. McAleenan, David L. Roark.(Nakajima, Simon) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Simon Nakajima on behalf of Mark Koumans, Kevin K. McAleenan, David L. Roark. (Nakajima, Simon) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the undersigned for an Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on November 15, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, 10007. Plaintiff's counsel, or the defendant's counsel in removed cases, is responsible for distributing copies of this Notice to all parties. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 11/15/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/30/2019) (ama) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. David L. Roark served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Li Chen. (Zhang, Dehai) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Kevin K. McAleenan served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Li Chen., AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Kevin K. McAleenan served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Li Chen. (Zhang, Dehai) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Mark Koumans served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Li Chen. (Zhang, Dehai) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Zhang, Dehai) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) FIRST COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Mark Koumans, Kevin K. McAleenan, David L. Roark (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17629715).Document filed by Li Chen.(Zhang, Dehai) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.