This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:25:47 (UTC).

CHEN v. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 CHEN filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy Berman Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03652

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amy Berman Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAM CHEN

Defendant

DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

200 Independence Avenue, Sw

Washington, DC 202021

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel J. Stotter

Attorney at STOTTER AND ASSOCIATES, LLC

408 Sw Monroe Avenue, Suite M210E

Corvallis, OR 97333

Sean Terrell Malone

Attorney at SEAN T. MALONE, ATTORNEY AT LAW

259 E. 5Th Avenue, Suite 200-C

Eugene, OR 97401

Defendant Attorney

Kenneth A. Adebonojo

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

555 Fourth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Terrell Malone on behalf of RAM CHEN (Malone, Sean) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Adebonojo on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

2 #1

Notice and Consent

#2

(#2) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6627463) filed by RAM CHEN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant must file its response to the #1 complaint by February 17, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/21/2020. (lcabj3) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Terrell Malone on behalf of RAM CHEN (Malone, Sean) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Adebonojo on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zrdj) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6627463) filed by RAM CHEN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less