This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/13/2022 at 07:55:48 (UTC).

Chen v. Cioppa

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 Chen filed an Immigration - Naturalization lawsuit against Cioppa. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric R. Komitee. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00175

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Naturalization

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eric R. Komitee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yong Chen

Defendant

District Director Thomas Cioppa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Taobo Zheng

Attorney at Law Office of Taobo Zheng, Esq.

39-07 Prince Street, Suite 3K

Flushing, NY 11354

Defendant Attorney

Amanda Civic

Attorney at DOJ-USAO

271-A Cadman Plaza East

Brooklyn, NY 11201

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. (Guy, Alicia) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Thomas Cioppa (Civic, Amanda) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Civic on behalf of Thomas Cioppa (aty to be noticed) (Civic, Amanda) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yong Chen. Thomas Cioppa served on 1/13/2022, answer due 3/14/2022. (Zheng, Taobo) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT YONG CHEN against Thomas Cioppa filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15188347 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Yong Chen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Zheng, Taobo) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where District Director Thomas Cioppa is a litigant