This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2022 at 06:37:10 (UTC).

CHEN et al v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 CHEN filed an Other lawsuit against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00143

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colleen Kollar-Kotelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHUANRUI CHEN

SHAN HUANG

Defendants

UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE

CONSULATE GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA IN GUANGZHOU, CHINA

UR MENDOZA JADDOU

ANTONY BLINKEN

LISA K. HELLER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James O. Hacking, III

Attorney at HACKING LAW PRACTICE, LLC

10900 Manchester Road, Suite 203

St. Louis, MO 63122

Defendant Attorneys

Anthony Messuri

Attorney at DOJ-CIV

450 5Th Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20530

Ernesto Horacio Molina, Jr.

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

Po Box 878, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons Jaddou

1 #3

Summons USCIS

1 #4

Summons Blinken

1 #5

Summons Local US Attorney

1 #6

Summons Consul

1 #7

Summons DOS

1 #8

Summons Garland

1 #9

Summons Consulate

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Notice and Consent

#3

(#3) ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/27/22. (DM) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Ernesto Horacio Molina, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Molina, Ernesto) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Messuri on behalf of All Defendants (Messuri, Anthony) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ANTONY BLINKEN served on 2/4/2022; CONSULATE GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA IN GUANGZHOU, CHINA served on 2/4/2022; LISA K. HELLER served on 2/4/2022; UR MENDOZA JADDOU served on 2/9/2022; UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 2/9/2022; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 2/4/2022, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/14/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/1/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/2/2022.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hacking, James) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Messuri on behalf of All Defendants (Messuri, Anthony) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Ernesto Horacio Molina, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Molina, Ernesto) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/27/22. (DM) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (znmg) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ANTONY BLINKEN, CONSULATE GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA IN GUANGZHOU, CHINA, LISA K. HELLER, UR MENDOZA JADDOU, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8993038) filed by SHAN HUANG, CHUANRUI CHEN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Jaddou, #3 Summons USCIS, #4 Summons Blinken, #5 Summons Local US Attorney, #6 Summons Consul, #7 Summons DOS, #8 Summons Garland, #9 Summons Consulate)(Hacking, James) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant