This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/07/2019 at 07:49:48 (UTC).

Chembulk Trading II, LLC v. M/T Chem Ranger, et al

Case Summary

On 08/08/2019 Chembulk Trading II, LLC filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against M/T Chem Ranger. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr and Brian A. Jackson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00513

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

Presiding Judge

Brian A. Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chembulk Trading II, LLC

Defendants

M/T Chem Ranger

Lantern Maritime Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daphne P. McNutt

Attorney at Barry & Company, LLC

612 Gravier Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

William Briggs Scott

Attorney at Barry & Company, LLC

612 Gravier Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant Attorneys

Henry J. Rodriguez

Attorney at Wilson Elser

650 Poydras Street, Ste 2200

New Orleans, LA 70130

Antonio J. Rodriguez

Attorney at Wilson Elser

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2200, Ste 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70130

Michael A. Harowski

Attorney at Wilson Elser

650 Poydras Street, Ste 2200

New Orleans, LA 70130

Alanson T. Chenault, IV

Attorney at Wilson Elser

650 Poydras St., Ste. 2200, New Orleans

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

15 #2

Attachment Proposed Order

15 #1

Memorandum in Support of Motion to Set Security

#3

2 #1

Attachment

#2

1 #5

Attachment

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Affidavit

1 #2

Affidavit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (SWE) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER granting #26 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/20/2019. (SWE) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Chembulk Trading II, LLC (McNutt, Daphne) Modified on 9/12/2019 to edit the text (KAH). (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/24/2019 at 09:45 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 10/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/10/2019. (SGO) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) USM 285 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Seizure served on M/T Chem Ranger on 08/09/2019. (US Marshal, ) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER granting #22 Motion to Withdraw #15 Motion to Set Security. The hearing set for 8/15/2019 at 2:00 p.m. is CANCELLED. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the motion pending at docket entry 15. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/14/2019. (SWE) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION to Withdraw #15 MOTION to Set Security by Lantern Maritime Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harowski, Michael) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Support of #15 MOTION to Set Security filed by Lantern Maritime Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(SWE) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #19 MOTION for Leave to File the Supplemental Memorandum in Support of #15 MOTION to Set Security filed by Lantern Maritime Co. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/14/2019. (SWE) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Leave to File a Reply to #15 MOTION to Set Security filed by Lantern Maritime Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Order)(Harowski, Michael) Modified on 8/14/2019 to edit the docket text (SWE). (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #6 MOTION for an Order Appointing Global Maritime Security as Substitute Custodian. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 08/09/2019. (NLT) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 MOTION to Substitute Exhibit 2 of Verified Complaint (Doc. 1) Affidavit of Attorney Daphne P. McNutt filed by Chembulk Trading II, LLC. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 08/09/2019. (NLT) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Payment of $250.00 Bond by Chembulk Trading II, LLC. Filing fee $ 250, receipt number ALAMDC-1982846. (McNutt, Daphne) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Substitute Exhibit 2 of Verified Complaint (Doc. 1) Affidavit of Attorney Daphne P. McNutt by Chembulk Trading II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Attorney Daphne P. McNutt)(McNutt, Daphne) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for an Order Appointing Global Maritime Security as Substitute Custodian by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(McNutt, Daphne) Modified on 8/9/2019 to edit the text (NLT). (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Warrant of Arrest as to M/T CHEM RANGER regarding #2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by All Plaintiffs. (McNutt, Daphne) Modified on 8/9/2019 to edit the text (NLT). (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chembulk Trading II, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Chembulk Tankers, LLC and Chembulk Holding, LLC for Chembulk Trading II, LLC.. (McNutt, Daphne) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION Allow Vessel to Move by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(McNutt, Daphne) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(McNutt, Daphne) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against M/T Chem Ranger, in rem, Lantern Marine Co. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1982405.), filed by Chembulk Trading II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Attachment)(McNutt, Daphne) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/9/2019 in accordance with record document 8) (NLT). (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Henry J. Rodriguez

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alanson Trigg Chenault

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael A Harowski