This case was last updated from PACER on 04/24/2021 at 10:33:35 (UTC).

Cheldan Homes, L.P. v. National Builders Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 Cheldan Homes, L P filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against National Builders Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sean D. Jordan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00155

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sean D. Jordan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cheldan Homes, L.P.

Defendant

National Builders Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy Micah Dortch

Attorney at Potts Law Firm LLP - Dallas

2911 Turtle Creek Blvd, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75219

Maryssa Jane Simpson

Attorney at Potts Law Firm LLP - Dallas

2911 Turtle Creek Blvd, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendant Attorney

Alicia G Curran

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor - Dallas

3100 Commerica Bank Center, 1717 Main Street

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#4

(#4) RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Cheldan Homes, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dortch, Timothy) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) MOTION for More Definite Statement by National Builders Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Curran, Alicia) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to National Builders Insurance Company. (mem) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Cheldan Homes, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dortch, Timothy) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for More Definite Statement by National Builders Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Curran, Alicia) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to National Builders Insurance Company. (mem) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mcg) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (mcg) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against National Builders Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8259523.), filed by Cheldan Homes, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dortch, Timothy) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cheldan Homes, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where National Builders Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Maryssa Jane Simpson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy M Dortch