This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/19/2020 at 09:32:24 (UTC).

Cheldan Homes LP v. National Builders Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 Cheldan Homes LP filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against National Builders Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam A. Lindsay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-03186

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam A. Lindsay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cheldan Homes LP

Defendant

National Builders Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy M Dortch

Attorney at Potts Law Firm LLP

2911 Turtle Creek Blvd, Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75219

Maryssa Jane Simpson

Attorney at Potts Law Firm, LLP

2911 Turtle Creek Blvd., Suite 1000

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendant Attorneys

Gregory S Hudson

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

1221 Mckinney, Suite 2900

Houston, TX 77020

Alicia G Curran

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

1717 Main St, Suite 3100

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #10 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Cheldan Homes LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dortch, Timothy) Modified text on 12/16/2020 (mjr). (Entered: 12/15/2020)

10 #2

Exhibit(s) B

10 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#10

(#10) MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by National Builders Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (Curran, Alicia) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#9

(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against National Builders Insurance Company filed by Cheldan Homes LP. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Dortch, Timothy) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to National Builders Insurance Company; served on 10/22/2020. (hml) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER: Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint that cures the deficiencies noted in this order by November 6, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/22/2020) (svc) Modified filed date on 10/26/2020 (mla). (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Maryssa Jane Simpson on behalf of Cheldan Homes LP. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Simpson, Maryssa) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to National Builders Insurance Company. (hml) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#4

(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cheldan Homes LP. (Dortch, Timothy) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#2

(#2) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Cheldan Homes LP. (Dortch, Timothy) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against National Builders Insurance Company filed by Cheldan Homes LP. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11281425) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Dortch, Timothy) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #11 Motion to Extend Time. Accordingly the deadline for Plaintiff Cheldan Homes, LP to file its response to Defendant's Motion for More Definite Statement is 1/11/2021; and the deadline for Defendant to reply to Plaintiff's response is 2/1/2021. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 12/16/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #10 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Cheldan Homes LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dortch, Timothy) Modified text on 12/16/2020 (mjr). (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by National Builders Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (Curran, Alicia) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against National Builders Insurance Company filed by Cheldan Homes LP. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Dortch, Timothy) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to National Builders Insurance Company; served on 10/22/2020. (hml) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint that cures the deficiencies noted in this order by November 6, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/22/2020) (svc) Modified filed date on 10/26/2020 (mla). (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Maryssa Jane Simpson on behalf of Cheldan Homes LP. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Simpson, Maryssa) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to National Builders Insurance Company. (hml) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cheldan Homes LP. (Dortch, Timothy) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Cheldan Homes LP. (Dortch, Timothy) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against National Builders Insurance Company filed by Cheldan Homes LP. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11281425) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Dortch, Timothy) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cheldan Homes, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where National Builders Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory S. Hudson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alicia G Curran