This case was last updated from PACER on 04/24/2021 at 08:27:56 (UTC).

Chehade v. Newman

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 Chehade filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Newman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jorge L. Alonso. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01036

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jorge L. Alonso

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Iymen H. Chehade

Defendant

Marie Newman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rima Kapitan

Attorney at Kapitan Law Office, Ltd.

P.O. Box 6779

Chicago, IL 60680

Defendant Attorneys

Sarah Clouse

Attorney at U.S. House of Representatives Office of General Counsel

219 Cannon House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515

Brooks Hanner

Attorney at Office of General Counsel

5140 O'Neill House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515

Douglas Neal Letter

Attorney at Office of General Counsel, U.S. House of Representatives

5140 O'Neill House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515

Todd Barry Tatelman

Attorney at Office of General Counsel

219 Cannon House Office Building

Washington, DC 20515

Edward B. Mullen, III

Attorney at Ed Mullen, Esq.

2129 N. Western Ave

Chicago, IL 60647

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion to dismiss #18 shall be filed by 4/23/21; Defendant's reply shall be filed by 5/7/21. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

18 #1

Exhibit

#18

(#18) MOTION by Defendant Marie Newman to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Marie Newman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#17

(#17) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Telephonic motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendant's motion to hold case in abeyance #11 is denied. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#16

(#16) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Marie Newman by Edward B. Mullen, III (Mullen, Edward) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#15

(#15) REPLY by Marie Newman to response in opposition to motion #14 (Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#14

(#14) RESPONSE by Iymen H. Chehadein Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Marie Newman to stay proceedings #11 (Kapitan, Rima) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

#13

(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: At the parties' request, motion hearing previously set for 3/17/21 is stricken and reset to 3/18/21 at 9:30 a.m. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 888-808-6929 and the access code is 4911854. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

#11

(#11) MOTION by Defendant Marie Newman to stay proceedings (Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Marie Newman by Sarah Clouse (Clouse, Sarah) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Marie Newman by Todd Barry Tatelman (Tatelman, Todd) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#4

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Joint motion for a briefing schedule #4 is granted. Defendant's dispositive motion shall be filed by 3/25/21; Plaintiff's response shall be filed by 4/26/21; Defendant's reply shall be filed by 5/10/21. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 02/28/2021)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Marie Newman by Douglas Neal Letter (Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

1 #2

Exhibit State Court Docket

1 #1

Exhibit State Court Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2021L000626) filed by Marie Newman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Docket)(Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion to dismiss #18 shall be filed by 4/23/21; Defendant's reply shall be filed by 5/7/21. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION by Defendant Marie Newman to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Marie Newman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Telephonic motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendant's motion to hold case in abeyance #11 is denied. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Marie Newman by Edward B. Mullen, III (Mullen, Edward) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPLY by Marie Newman to response in opposition to motion #14 (Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE by Iymen H. Chehadein Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Marie Newman to stay proceedings #11 (Kapitan, Rima) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: At the parties' request, motion hearing previously set for 3/17/21 is stricken and reset to 3/18/21 at 9:30 a.m. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 888-808-6929 and the access code is 4911854. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Motion by Douglas Neal Letter for presentment of motion to stay #11 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 3/17/2021 at 09:30 AM. (Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION by Defendant Marie Newman to stay proceedings (Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Iymen H. Chehade by Rima Kapitan (Kapitan, Rima) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Joint motion for a briefing schedule #4 is granted. Defendant's dispositive motion shall be filed by 3/25/21; Plaintiff's response shall be filed by 4/26/21; Defendant's reply shall be filed by 5/10/21. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 02/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MAILED Notice of Removal to counsel of record. (lma, ) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jg, ) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Marie Newman by Brooks Hanner (Hanner, Brooks) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Marie Newman by Sarah Clouse (Clouse, Sarah) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Marie Newman by Todd Barry Tatelman (Tatelman, Todd) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION by Defendant Marie Newman to set a briefing schedule (JOINT MOTION) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Marie Newman by Douglas Neal Letter (Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2021L000626) filed by Marie Newman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Docket)(Letter, Douglas) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rima N. Kapitan