This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/23/2023 at 02:55:53 (UTC).

Cheema et al v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 Cheema filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rachel P. Kovner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-06719

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rachel P. Kovner

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Asma Cheema

Talha Aslam

Defendants

United States of America

Department of State

Antony J. Blinken

National Visa Center

U.S. Embassy Islamabad

Donald Blome

John and Jane Doe(s) 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ronen Sarraf

Defendant Attorney

Melanie M. Speight

 

Court Documents

#1

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie M. Speight on behalf of Antony J. Blinken, Donald Blome, Department of State, National Visa Center, U.S. Embassy Islamabad, United States of America (aty to be noticed) (Speight, Melanie) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketSCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference will be held by telephone before Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 1/26/2023 at 2:00 p.m. The parties are directed to call (888) 278-0296 and enter the access code 2012636 to join the conference. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 11/9/2022. (Miyamoto, Matthew) Modified on 11/9/2022 (TC). (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Antony J. Blinken, Donald Blome, Department of State, National Visa Center, U.S. Embassy Islamabad, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (KD) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (KD) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with CIVIL COVER SHEET and PROPOSED SUMMONS against Antony J. Blinken, Donald Blome, Department of State, John and Jane Doe(s) 1-10, National Visa Center, U.S. Embassy Islamabad, United States of America filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16108256 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Talha Aslam, Asma Cheema. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Sarraf, Ronen) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Antony J. Blinken, Donald Blome, Department of State, John and Jane Doe(s) 1-10, National Visa Center, U.S. Embassy Islamabad, United States of America filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16108199 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Talha Aslam, Asma Cheema. (Sarraf, Ronen) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less