This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/26/2022 at 08:32:48 (UTC).

Cheek v. Lockheed Martin Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 10/27/2022 Cheek filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Lockheed Martin Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is James Donato. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-06630

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Donato

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sidney Cheek

Defendants

Lockheed Martin Corporation

Air & Liquid Systems Corporation

Alfa Laval Inc.

Sharpless Corporation

ARKEMA, INC.

Armstrong International Inc

Asco, LP

Asco Power Technologies, LP

Aurora Pump Company

Barretts Minerals, Inc.

Block Drug Company, Inc.

Brenntag Specialties, LLC

Brenntag North America, Inc.

Carver Pump Company

Chattem Inc.

CLA-VAL Co.

Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.

Coen Company, Inc.

Crown Laboratories, Inc.

54 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stuart James Purdy

Attorney at Simon Greenstone Panatier, P.C.

3760 Kilroy Airport Way, Suite 540

Long Beach, CA 90806

Marc Ian Willick

Attorney at Simon Greenstone Panatier, PC

3760 Kilroy Airport Way, Suite 680

Long Beach, CA 90806

Defendant Attorneys

Guy P. Glazier

Attorney at Glazier Yee LLP

707 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 2025

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Brian Thomas Clark

Attorney at Glazier Yee LLP

707 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 2025

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Laura Patricia Yee

Attorney at Glazier Yee LLP

707 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 2025

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Ana Teresa Reeg

Attorney at Hawkins Parnell & Young, LLP

445 S. Figueroa Street, Suite 3200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Gina Ann Haran

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith

45 Fremont Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105

Gilliam Fipp Stewart

Attorney at CMBG3 Law LLC

100 Spectrum Center Drive, Suite 820

Irvine, CA 92618

Andrew Livingston Sharp

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield PLLP

2185 North California Boulevard, Suite 575

Walnut Creek, CA 94596-7323

Gary David Sharp

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield, PLLP

2185 North California Boulevard, Suite 575

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Juliana Salfiti

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitiz Edelman & Dicker LLP

655 Montgomery Street, Suite 900

San Francisco, CA 94111

Nicolas Peter Martin

Attorney at Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker LLP

525 Market Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Davit Shanto

Attorney at Berkes, Crane, Santana & Spangler LLP

515 South Figueroa Street, Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Karen Lynn Finateri Silbiger

Attorney at Berkes Crane Santana & Spangler LLP

515 South Figueroa Street, Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Theodore Yarbrough

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

101 W. Broadway, Ste 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

John Russell Lister

Attorney at Palmieri Tyler Wiener Wilhelm Waldron

1900 Main Street, Suite 700

Irvine, CA 92614

Viiu Spangler Khare

Attorney at Berkes Crane Santana & Spangler, LLP

515 S. Figueroa Street, Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Other Attorneys

Sheryl Mindy Rosenberg

Attorney at Clyde & Co US LLP

355 S. Grand Avenue, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Danny Kim

Attorney at CMBG3 Law LLC

100 Spectrum Center Drive, Suite 820

Irvine, CA 92618

Bina Ghanaat

Attorney at Hugo Parker, LLP

240 Stockton Street, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

30 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#126

(#126) NOTICE of Appearance by Janice W. Man On behalf of The Gorman-Rupp Company (Man, Janice) (Filed on 12/23/2022) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

#125

(#125) Certificate of Interested Entities by Milwaukee Valve Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent NIBCO, Inc. for Milwaukee Valve Company, LLC. (Lee, Richard) (Filed on 12/23/2022) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

124 #1

Exhibit Answer to Complaint

124 #124

Main Document

#123

(#123) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Michael Lee on Behalf of Defendant Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc. n/k/a Milwaukee Valve Company, LLC (Lee, Richard) (Filed on 12/23/2022) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

#122

(#122) Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Action Without Prejudice As to Defendant Arkema, Inc. f/k/a Pennwalt Corporation and Elf Atochem North America, Inc., sued individually and as successor-by-merger to Wallace & Tiernan d/b/a WTS Pharmcraft filed by Arkema, Inc.. (Haran, Gina) (Filed on 12/22/2022) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

121 #1

Proposed Order [proposed] ORDER DISMISSING ALL CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFEN

121 #121

Main Document

#120

(#120) NOTICE by Keckley Manufacturing Company OF INTERESTED PARTIES (Gilbert, Warren) (Filed on 12/16/2022) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Ana Teresa Reeg (Reeg, Ana) (Filed on 10/31/2022) Modified on 11/1/2022 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/31/2022)

#6

(#6) Joinder re #1 Notice of Removal, DEFENDANT ALFA LAVAL INC.S JOINDER IN NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Alfa Laval Inc.. (Reeg, Ana) (Filed on 10/31/2022) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

#5

(#5) RedCo Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Personal Injury byRedco Corporation. (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/31/2022) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/19/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/26/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2022) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Lockheed Martin Corporation identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation for Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Clark, Brian) (Filed on 10/27/2022) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Main Document

124 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#126) NOTICE of Appearance by Janice W. Man On behalf of The Gorman-Rupp Company (Man, Janice) (Filed on 12/23/2022) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#125) Certificate of Interested Entities by Milwaukee Valve Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent NIBCO, Inc. for Milwaukee Valve Company, LLC. (Lee, Richard) (Filed on 12/23/2022) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#124) NOTICE by Milwaukee Valve Company, LLC of Filing State Court Answer to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answer to Complaint)(Lee, Richard) (Filed on 12/23/2022) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#123) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Michael Lee on Behalf of Defendant Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc. n/k/a Milwaukee Valve Company, LLC (Lee, Richard) (Filed on 12/23/2022) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#122) Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Action Without Prejudice As to Defendant Arkema, Inc. f/k/a Pennwalt Corporation and Elf Atochem North America, Inc., sued individually and as successor-by-merger to Wallace & Tiernan d/b/a WTS Pharmcraft filed by Arkema, Inc.. (Haran, Gina) (Filed on 12/22/2022) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#121) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Sidney Cheek. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [proposed] ORDER DISMISSING ALL CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANT COEN COMPANY, INC. f/k/a COEN MANUFACTURING CORP., sued individually and as successor-ininterest to TODD COMBUSTION, INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE)(Willick, Marc) (Filed on 12/19/2022) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#120) NOTICE by Keckley Manufacturing Company OF INTERESTED PARTIES (Gilbert, Warren) (Filed on 12/16/2022) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#119) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicolas Peter Martin (Martin, Nicolas) (Filed on 12/16/2022) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#118) NOTICE of Appearance by Juliana Salfiti (Salfiti, Juliana) (Filed on 12/16/2022) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#117) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byBlock Drug Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEFENDANT BLOCK DRUG COMPANY, INC.'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL)(Salfiti, Juliana) (Filed on 12/16/2022) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE by Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc of filing State Court Answer to Complaint (Bergstrom, Emily) (Filed on 11/1/2022) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Interested Entities by Alfa Laval Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Alfa Laval AB for Alfa Laval Inc. (Reeg, Ana) (Filed on 10/31/2022) Modified on 11/1/2022 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Removed Complaint for Personal Injury Asbestos (Negligence, Strict Liability, and Fraud) by Alfa Laval Inc.. (Reeg, Ana) (Filed on 10/31/2022) Modified on 11/1/2022 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Ana Teresa Reeg (Reeg, Ana) (Filed on 10/31/2022) Modified on 11/1/2022 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joinder re #1 Notice of Removal, DEFENDANT ALFA LAVAL INC.S JOINDER IN NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Alfa Laval Inc.. (Reeg, Ana) (Filed on 10/31/2022) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RedCo Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Personal Injury byRedco Corporation. (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/31/2022) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/19/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/26/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2022) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/14/2022. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2022) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Lockheed Martin Corporation identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation for Lockheed Martin Corporation. (Clark, Brian) (Filed on 10/27/2022) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is 22CV018248. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-17674187). Filed byLockheed Martin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Clark, Brian) (Filed on 10/27/2022) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Asco Power Technologies, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where Crown Laboratories Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Sharpless is a litigant

Latest cases where COEN COMPANY,INC. is a litigant