This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/23/2019 at 07:31:00 (UTC).

Chebro v. Great Dane, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2019 Chebro filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Great Dane, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vanessa L. Bryant. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01495

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vanessa L. Bryant

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Chebro

Defendants

Great Dane, LLC

Sturdy-Lite, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eugene A. Skowronski

Attorney at Law Offices of Eugene A. Skowronski

Webster Bank Building, 200 Division St.

Ansonia, CT 06418

Defendant Attorneys

Steven J Zakrzewski

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP-CT

95 Glastonbury Boulevard, Suite 206

Glastonbury, CT 06033

John J. Robinson

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP-CT

95 Glastonbury Boulevard, Suite 206

Glastonbury, CT 06033

Kelcie Burns Reid

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

95 Glastonbury Blvd., Ste 206

Glastonbury, CT 06033

Erin Canalia

Attorney at Wolf, Horowitz & Etlinger, LLC

750 Main Street, Ste 606

Hartford, CT 06103

Deborah Etlinger

Attorney at Wolf, Horowitz & Etlinger, LLC

750 Main Street, Ste 606

Hartford, CT 06103

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Zakrzewski, Steven) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#23

(#23) Memorandum in Support re #22 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sturdy-Lite, Inc.. (Canalia, Erin) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#21

(#21) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Great Dane, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Pines S LLC, Corporate Parent Trailer Investors, Corporate Parent HCNI I LLC for Great Dane, LLC. (Zakrzewski, Steven) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Kelcie Burns Reid on behalf of Great Dane, LLC (Reid, Kelcie) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#18

(#18) Supplemental NOTICE by Sturdy-Lite, Inc. re #4 Notice (Other) Certificate of Notice (Canalia, Erin) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#16

No Description Available

14 #1

Removal Standing Order

#14

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Etlinger on behalf of Sturdy-Lite, Inc. (Etlinger, Deborah) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Sturdy-Lite, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal Local Rule Statement in Compliance with Standing Order (Canalia, Erin) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J Zakrzewski on behalf of Great Dane, LLC (Zakrzewski, Steven) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Robinson on behalf of Great Dane, LLC (Robinson, John) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#4

(#18) Supplemental NOTICE by Sturdy-Lite, Inc. re #4 Notice (Other) Certificate of Notice (Canalia, Erin) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#1

(#8) NOTICE by Sturdy-Lite, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal Local Rule Statement in Compliance with Standing Order (Canalia, Erin) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • (#27) NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Discovery status teleconference set for 3/25/2020 at 3:00 PM before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. To participate in the teleconference, the parties are ordered to call Chambers at 860-240-3123 with all parties on the line. In the alternative, the parties may call Chambers to distribute a dial-in number to the Court. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court has evaluated the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report #25 and sets the following case management deadlines: A discovery status teleconference will take place on 3/25/2020 at 3:00 pm. Fact discovery is due by 6/30/2020. Reports by Plaintiff's expert witnesses are due by 8/31/2020, and depositions of any such experts are due by 10/31/2020. Reports by Defendant's expert witnesses are due by 12/31/2020, and depositions of any such experts are due by 2/28/2021. Fact depositions shall be completed by 2/28/2021.Dispositive motions are due by 3/31/2021. If no dispositive motions are filed, the joint trial memorandum ("JTM") is due by 4/30/2021, and a bench trial will take place in the month of June 2021 in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. If dispositive motions are filed, the JTM is due by 11/30/2021, and a bench trial will take place in the month of January 2022 in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. The court will not extend this schedule except on a showing of good cause. Counsel shall be prepared to present evidence on any day during the month that the bench trial is scheduled to take place. The parties are directed to closely follow Chambers' Practices on the Courts website--including the deadlines and format of filings--when completing and filing the JTM, which shall be accompanied by the motions in limine. All evidentiary objections raised in the JTM must be the subject of a motion in limine and supported by applicable Second Circuit precedent. The parties' exhibit binders and electronic exhibits, as well as any courtroom technology requests, must be submitted no later than two weeks before the month of trial. The Court also requests that any courtesy copies sent to Chambers be printed from the docket and contain the header of the Court's electronic filing system. If and/or when the parties feel that a settlement conference before a Magistrate Judge would be productive, the parties may jointly request such on the docket. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/12/2019. (Dannenmaier, Katherine) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Zakrzewski, Steven) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • (#24) NOTICE RE: MOTION TO DISMISS. The parties are reminded that the pendency of a motion to dismiss does not automatically stay discovery, except in cases covered by the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act. See Brooks v. Macy's, Inc., No. 10-CIV-5304, 2010 WL 5297756, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. Dec. 21, 2010) (collecting cases), reh'g denied, No. 10-CIV-5304, 2011 WL 1362191 (S.D.N.Y. Apr. 8, 2011); see also Moran v. Flaherty, No. 92-CV-3200, 1992 WL 276913, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. Sept. 25, 1992). The court may enter a stay of discovery in its discretion upon a showing [as distinguished from an assertion] of good cause. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c); see also Integrated Sys. & Power, Inc. v. Honeywell Int'l, Inc. , No. 09-CIV-5874, 2009 WL 2777076, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. Sept. 1, 2009); accord Ellington Credit Fund, Ltd. v. Select Portfolio Servs., Inc. , No. 08-CV-2437, 2009 WL 274483, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. Feb. 3, 2009). In determining whether good cause exists, the court considers several factors including: (1) whether a defendant has made a strong showing that the plaintiff's claim is unmeritorious, (2) the breadth of discovery and the burden of responding to it, and (3) the risk of unfair prejudice to the party opposing the stay. Negrete v. Citibank, N.A. , No. 15-CV-7250, 2015 WL 8207466, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. Dec. 7, 2015). Other factors include the nature of the case, whether dismissal will resolve the case, effect of dismissal on the scope of discovery, age of the case, complexity of discovery needed, remedy sought, extensions previously granted, parties' diligence, judicial efficiency, and other appropriate factors. Discovery in this case is NOT stayed. Accordingly, any party moving to stay discovery must demonstrate, as oppose to assert, the Court should exercise its discretion to stay the case. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/24/2019. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Memorandum in Support re #22 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sturdy-Lite, Inc.. (Canalia, Erin) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION to Dismiss by Sturdy-Lite, Inc..Responses due by 11/12/2019 (Canalia, Erin) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Great Dane, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Pines S LLC, Corporate Parent Trailer Investors, Corporate Parent HCNI I LLC for Great Dane, LLC. (Zakrzewski, Steven) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Great Dane, LLC.(Zakrzewski, Steven) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Kelcie Burns Reid on behalf of Great Dane, LLC (Reid, Kelcie) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Supplemental NOTICE by Sturdy-Lite, Inc. re #4 Notice (Other) Certificate of Notice (Canalia, Erin) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Etlinger on behalf of Sturdy-Lite, Inc. (Etlinger, Deborah) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE by Sturdy-Lite, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal Local Rule Statement in Compliance with Standing Order (Canalia, Erin) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Consent NOTICE by Great Dane, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal (Zakrzewski, Steven) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J Zakrzewski on behalf of Great Dane, LLC (Zakrzewski, Steven) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Robinson on behalf of Great Dane, LLC (Robinson, John) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE by Sturdy-Lite, Inc. Certificate of Notice (Canalia, Erin) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by Sturdy-Lite, Inc. Notice of Pending Motions in Compliance with Standing Order (Canalia, Erin) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sturdy-Lite, Inc.. (Canalia, Erin) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sturdy-Lite, Inc. from Connecticut Superior Court Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5453002, filed by Sturdy-Lite, Inc..(Canalia, Erin) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Great Dane LP is a litigant