This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2019 at 08:23:59 (UTC).

Cheatham v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2019 Cheatham filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen Michael Doyle and Jerusha T. Adams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00743

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Stephen Michael Doyle

Jerusha T. Adams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ferman S. Cheatham, Jr.

Defendants

Tim Parkman, Inc.

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London

Chase Home Finance, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Stephen Harper

Attorney at Michael S Harper, PC

Po Box 780608

Tallassee, AL 36078

Defendant Attorneys

Carleton P. Ketcham, III

Attorney at Lloyd, Gray, Whitehead & Monroe, PC

2501 20Th Place South, Suite 300

Birmingham, AL 35223

Graham Ross Pulvere

Attorney at Lloyd Gray Whitehead Monroe, P.C.

2501 Twentieth Place South; Ste 300

Birmingham, AL 35223

John David Collins

Attorney at Maynard, Cooper & Gale PC

1901 Sixth Avenue North, Suite 2400

Birmingham, AL 35203

Joshua Robert Hess

Attorney at Maynard Cooper & Gale PC

1901 Sixth Ave N - 2400 Regions Harbert Plaza

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#1

(#25) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Chase Home Finance, L.L.C., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Hess, Joshua) (Main Document 25 replaced on 11/27/2019 to attach a corrected PDF document to correct the Presiding Judge's initials as JTA and not SMD) (cnw, ). (Entered: 11/27/2019)

26 #1

Corrected Main PDF docket entry [25]

#21

(#21) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed Motion for Extension to File Responsive Pleading) by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Tim Parkman, Inc. (Pulvere, Graham) Modified on 11/12/2019 to clarify text(cnw, ). (Entered: 11/11/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Chase Home Finance, L.L.C., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Tim Parkman, Inc., and returned to counsel for personal service by process server. (cnw, ) Modified on 10/4/2019 to clarify text & correct date (cnw, ). (Entered: 10/04/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#23

(#23) Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams as presiding Judge. Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case. (cnw, ) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#4

SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ferman S. Cheatham, Jr.; Chase Home Finance, L.L.C., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Tim Parkman, Inc., served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #4 for pdf which was incorrectly filed as a certificate of service) (cnw, ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

27 #1

Exhibit A

27 #2

Exhibit B

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Correction re #25 Answer to Complaint, to attach a corrected PDF document to correct the Presiding Judge's initials as JTA and not SMD. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Main PDF docket entry #25 )(cnw, ) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#5

SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ferman S. Cheatham, Jr.; Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #5 for pdf which was incorrectly filed as a certificate of service) (cnw, ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#6

(#6) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ferman S. Cheatham, Jr. (Harper, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#25

(#25) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Chase Home Finance, L.L.C., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Hess, Joshua) (Main Document 25 replaced on 11/27/2019 to attach a corrected PDF document to correct the Presiding Judge's initials as JTA and not SMD) (cnw, ). (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#27

(#27) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Tim Parkman, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Pulvere, Graham) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#24

(#24) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Hess, Joshua) Modified on 11/27/2019 to remove Chase Home Finance, L.L.C., as a filer (cnw, ). (Entered: 11/27/2019)

1 #3

original Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

receipt

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (PLF) Ferman S. Cheatham, Jr. (cnw, ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Tim Parkman, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Pulvere, Graham) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) NOTICE of Correction re #25 Answer to Complaint, to attach a corrected PDF document to correct the Presiding Judge's initials as JTA and not SMD. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Main PDF docket entry #25 )(cnw, ) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Chase Home Finance, L.L.C., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Hess, Joshua) (Main Document 25 replaced on 11/27/2019 to attach a corrected PDF document to correct the Presiding Judge's initials as JTA and not SMD) (cnw, ). (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Hess, Joshua) Modified on 11/27/2019 to remove Chase Home Finance, L.L.C., as a filer (cnw, ). (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams as presiding Judge. Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case. (cnw, ) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) TEXT ORDER: Upon consideration of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London and Tim Parkman, Inc.'s ("Defendants") Unopposed Motion for Extension to File Responsive Pleading (Doc. #21 ), it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Defendants may file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before November 27, 2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 11/12/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, ) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed Motion for Extension to File Responsive Pleading) by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Tim Parkman, Inc. (Pulvere, Graham) Modified on 11/12/2019 to clarify text(cnw, ). (Entered: 11/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) TEXT ORDER granting #19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File. Answer due from Chase Home Finance, L.L.C., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., on 11/27/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 11/5/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, ) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Chase Home Finance, L.L.C., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Hess, Joshua) Modified on 11/4/2019 to correct the motion event (cnw, ). (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London re #16 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Pulvere, Graham) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Return Receipt Card signed by R Jones signed by R Jones for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London served on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019. (Harper, Michael) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ferman S. Cheatham, Jr. (Harper, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ferman S. Cheatham, Jr.; Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #5 for pdf which was incorrectly filed as a certificate of service) (cnw, ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ferman S. Cheatham, Jr.; Chase Home Finance, L.L.C., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Tim Parkman, Inc., served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #4 for pdf which was incorrectly filed as a certificate of service) (cnw, ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) (SUMMONS Returned Executed) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ferman S. Cheatham, Jr re #1 Complaint, (Harper, Michael) Modified on 10/4/2019 to reflect the correct event (cnw, ). (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) (SUMMONS Returned Executed) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ferman S. Cheatham, Jr re #1 Complaint, (Harper, Michael) Modified on 10/4/2019 to reflect the correct event (cnw, ). (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (PLF) Ferman S. Cheatham, Jr. (cnw, ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Chase Home Finance, L.L.C., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Tim Parkman, Inc., and returned to counsel for personal service by process server. (cnw, ) Modified on 10/4/2019 to clarify text & correct date (cnw, ). (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ferman S. Cheatham, Jr. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cnw, ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Chase Home Finance, L.L.C., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Tim Parkman, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602055123.), filed by Ferman S. Cheatham, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 receipt)(cnw, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/7/2019: #3 original Civil Cover Sheet) (cnw, ). (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.