This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/24/2022 at 06:05:35 (UTC).

Chazmine Lindsey and Bernard Foley et al v. Abbott Laboratories et al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 Chazmine Lindsey and Bernard Foley filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Abbott Laboratories. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02895

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca R. Pallmeyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Chazmine Lindsey

Bernard Foley

Defendants

Abbott Laboratories

Mead Johnson & Company LLC

Mead Johnson Nutrition Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles Andrew Childers

Attorney at Levin Papantonio Rafferty

316 S. Baylen Street, Suite 600

Pensacola, FL 32502

James Elroy Douglas, Jr.

Attorney at Childers, Schlueter & Smith, LLC

Suite 100, 1932 North Druid Hills Road

Atlanta, GA 30319

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Summons

2 #2

Summons

#3

(#3) NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/23/2022.] (Entered: 05/10/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Transmittal Letter

5 #5

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

5 #1

*Restricted*

#6

(#6) MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to all Counsel of record. (nsf, ) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to all Counsel of record. (nsf, ) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Direct assignment. (nsf, ) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RECEIVED from Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:22-cv-01815 (nsf,) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. (ane) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/23/2022.] (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-7 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Case to be transferred to the Northern District of Illinois for inclusion MDL No. 3026. (ane) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2022: #1 Transmittal Letter) (ane). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/23/2022.] (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/23/2022.] (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Abbott Laboratories, Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(kxm) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/23/2022.] (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11785530) filed by Chazmine Lindsey and Bernard Foley(Individually as Surviving Parents of Makahi Foley, Deceased), Chazmine Lindsey and Bernard Foley(As Anticipated Administrators Of The Estate Of Makahi Foley). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kxm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/23/2022.] (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEAD JOHNSON NUTRITION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, a limited liability company is a litigant

Latest cases where Abbott Laboratories, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAMES E DOUGLAS, JR(Designation Retained)