This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/18/2022 at 09:40:16 (UTC).

Chavis v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 Chavis filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire Casualty Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04015

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marjorie Chavis

Defendants

State Farm Fire & Casualty Company

State Farm Fire & Casualty Co

Special Masters

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Sulphur, LA 70663

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chantell M Smith

Attorney at Cantrell Smith

724 Kirby St

Lake Charles, LA 70601

Defendant Attorney

Todd M Ammons

Attorney at Stockwell Sievert et al

127 Broad St 4Th Fl

Lake Charles, LA 70601

Special Master Attorneys

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Attorney at Juneau David

P O Drawer 51268

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney at Law Office of Cade R Cole

1523 Cypress St

Sulphur, LA 70663

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu, LA, Case Number 2021-3712 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4900918) filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit Suit Record, #3 State court petition)(Attorney Todd M Ammons added to party State Farm Fire & Casualty Company (pty:dft))(aty,Ammons, Todd) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Suit Record

1 #3

State court petition

#2

(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

2 #1

Exhibit A

2 #2

Exhibit B

#3

(#3) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/19/2021. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (aty,Ammons, Todd) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#5

(#5) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/22/2021. (crt,Taylor, L) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co.(aty,Ammons, Todd) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co.(aty,Ammons, Todd) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/22/2021. (crt,Taylor, L) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (aty,Ammons, Todd) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/19/2021. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE COURT Service Returned Executed. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company answer due 11/26/2021. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found within attachment #2 of document #1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu, LA, Case Number 2021-3712 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4900918) filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit Suit Record, #3 State court petition)(Attorney Todd M Ammons added to party State Farm Fire & Casualty Company (pty:dft))(aty,Ammons, Todd) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Todd M Ammons