This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/04/2021 at 09:48:13 (UTC).

Chavez v. New Prime, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 Chavez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against New Prime, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alan D Albright and Jeffrey C. Manske. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00327

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

Referral Judge

Jeffrey C. Manske

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mariell Chavez

Defendants

Imani Webster

New Prime, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Lesly Jones

Attorney at Thomas J. Henry Law, PLLC

P.O. Box 696025, 5711 University Heights Blvd., Suite 101

San Antonio, TX 78269

Defendant Attorneys

Robert J. Collins

Attorney at Gauntt, Earl, Binney & Koen, LLP

14643 Dallas Pkwy, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75254

Karl W. Koen

Attorney at Gauntt, Koen, Binney & Kidd, LLP

14643 Dallas Pkwy., Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75254

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Joint by New Prime, Inc., Imani Webster. (Koen, Karl) (Entered: 05/31/2021)

#3

(#3) Proposed Scheduling Order Agreed by New Prime, Inc., Imani Webster. (Koen, Karl) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

#2

(#2) DOCKET CONTROL ORDER PURSUANT TO RULES 16(b) AND 26(f). Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (bw) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

1 #4

List of Counsel of Record

1 #3

Index of State Court Documents

1 #2

Supplement Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by New Prime, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0542-14661437), filed by New Prime, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Index of State Court Documents, #4 List of Counsel of Record)(Koen, Karl) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Joint by New Prime, Inc., Imani Webster. (Koen, Karl) (Entered: 05/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Scheduling Order Agreed by New Prime, Inc., Imani Webster. (Koen, Karl) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKET CONTROL ORDER PURSUANT TO RULES 16(b) AND 26(f). Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (bw) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE (lad) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by New Prime, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0542-14661437), filed by New Prime, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Index of State Court Documents, #4 List of Counsel of Record)(Koen, Karl) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEW PRIME INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David L. Jones