This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/05/2021 at 07:26:37 (UTC).

Antelma Chavez v. Lincare Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/06/2020 Antelma Chavez filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Lincare Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Maria A. Audero and Michael W. Fitzgerald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-10211

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

Presiding Judge

Michael W. Fitzgerald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Antelma Chavez

Defendants

Lincare Inc.

DOES 1 through 100

Linde

Lincare Holdings, Inc.

Lindcare a Linde Company

DOES 1 through 100, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alex K. Hadjian

Attorney at Mancini and Associates APC

15303 Ventura Boulevard Suite 600

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Pamela A Triplett

Attorney at Mancini and Associates APLC

15303 Ventura Boulevard Suite 600

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Tara Jennifer Licata

Attorney at Mancini and Associates APLC

15303 Ventura Boulevard Suite 600

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Defendant Attorneys

Brian F Van Vleck

Attorney at Van Vleck Law Firm LLP

5757 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 535

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Stuart Harris Kluft

Attorney at Van Vleck Law Firm LLP

5757 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 535

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Daniel John Turner

Attorney at Van Vleck and Turner LLP

5757 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 535

Los Angeles, CA 90036

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#14

#15

#16

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER RE JURY TRIAL by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Last Day to Add Parties/Amend Pleadings 6/7/2021. Non-expert Discovery Cut-off 11/19/2021. Last Day to Hear Motions 12/20/2021. File Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, Exhibit and Witness Lists, Status Report regarding settlement, and all Motions in Limine 2/7/2022. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 2/28/2022 at 11:00 AM. Trial Date (Est. 5 to 10 Days) set for 3/22/2022 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 1/7/2022. (iv) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7-10 days, filed by Plaintiff Antelma Chavez.. (Hadjian, Alex) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • Docket(#13) SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Pursuant to General Order 20-09, the Court VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2021 at 11:00 a.m. No appearances shall be made. The Court will review the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report (due 12/21/2020) and issue pretrial and trial dates by separate order. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE Notice of Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a) or (c) filed by Plaintiff Antelma Chavez. (Triplett, Pamela) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference 01/04/21 at 11:00 AM (pg) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Antelma Chavez.. (Licata, Tara) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Lincare Inc. in Ventura Superior Court on 11/4/2020, attached as Exhibit 2. (jtil) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Antelma Chavez in Ventura Superior Court on 9/15/2020, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Lincare Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 , Declaration #5 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Declaration #4 , Notice of Related Case(s) #6 served on 11/06/2020. (Van Vleck, Brian) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Lincare Inc.. (Van Vleck, Brian) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DECLARATION of Paula Adams re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Lincare Inc.. (Van Vleck, Brian) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION of Daniel J. Turner re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Lincare Inc.. (Van Vleck, Brian) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Lincare Inc.. (Van Vleck, Brian) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Lincare Inc., identifying Lincare Holdings Inc., Linde PLC. (Van Vleck, Brian) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ventura County Superior Court, case number 56-2020-0054334-CU-WT-VTA Receipt No: ACACDC-28890931 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Lincare Inc.. (Attorney Brian F Van Vleck added to party Lincare Inc.(pty:dft))(Van Vleck, Brian) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LINDE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Lincare Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Lincare Holdings Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alex K. Hadjian