This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/02/2021 at 07:04:39 (UTC).

Chavez v. Finastra USA Corporation

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 Chavez filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Finastra USA Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sallie Kim and Edward M. Chen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01515

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Sallie Kim

Edward M. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steven R. Chavez

Defendant

Finastra USA Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cassandra M Ferrannini

Attorney at Downey Brand LLP

621 Capitol Mall 18Fl

Sacramento, CA 95814

Anthony Steven Chavez

Attorney at Downey Brand LLP

621 Capitol Mall, 18Th Floor

Sacramento, CA 95814

Defendant Attorneys

Jessica Maria Ewert

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard and Smith LLP

650 Town Center Drive, Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Meredith Cavallaro

Attorney at Paduano and Weintraub LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas, Ninth Floor

New York, NY 10020

John L. Barber

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois & Bisgaard & Smith LLP

650 Town Center Drive, Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Noah Hertz Bunzl

Attorney at Paduano and Weintraub LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas, Ninth Floor

New York, NY 10020

Julie Westcott O'Dell

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

650 Town Center Drive, Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#10

#8

#7

#6

#5

4 #1

Supplement Certificate of Good Standing - Appellate Division of the Supreme Cour

#4

3 #1

Supplement Certificate of Good Standing - Appellate Division of the Supreme Cour

#3

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Finastra USA Corporation #18 (Bunzl, Noah) (Filed on 4/1/2021) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #18 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/8/2021 is vacated and rescheduled for 7/15/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/8/2021. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to continue Case Management Conference filed by Finastra USA Corporation. (Bunzl, Noah) (Filed on 3/31/2021) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steven R. Chavez re #16 Case Management Scheduling Order, 1) Case Management Conference Order in Reassigned Case; 2) Standing Order for all Judges of the Northern District of California-Contents of Joint Case Management Statement; 3) Civil Standing Order-General; and 4) Civil Standing Order on Discovery (Chavez, Anthony) (Filed on 3/22/2021) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/8/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/1/2021. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/18/2021. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2021) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Finastra USA Corporation re #13 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), #12 Certificate of Interested Entities (Cavallaro, Meredith) (Filed on 3/11/2021) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Finastra USA Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, 2 Case Assigned by Intake,,, (Ewert, Jessica) (Filed on 3/10/2021) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byFinastra USA Corporation. (Cavallaro, Meredith) (Filed on 3/10/2021) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Certificate of Interested Entities by Finastra USA Corporation identifying Corporate Parent D + H USA Holdings LLC for. Finastra USA Corporation (Cavallaro, Meredith) (Filed on 3/10/2021) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 3/9/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2021) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Steven R. Chavez. (Chavez, Anthony) (Filed on 3/8/2021) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2021) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Finastra USA Corporation.. (Bunzl, Noah) (Filed on 3/8/2021) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER by Judge Sallie Kim granting #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (sklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2021) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER by Judge Sallie Kim granting #3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (sklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2021) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 5/31/202 1. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/7/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2021) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15654599.) filed by Finastra USA Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing - Appellate Division of the Supreme Court of the State of New York, Second Judicial Department)(Bunzl, Noah) (Filed on 3/4/2021) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15654256.) filed by Finastra USA Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing - Appellate Division of the Supreme Court of the State of New York, First Judicial Department)(Cavallaro, Meredith) (Filed on 3/4/2021) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2021) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG21085988. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-15650916). Filed byFinastra USA Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jessica M. Ewert in support of Notice of Removal, #2 Declaration of Jason Roufogalis in support of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ewert, Jessica) (Filed on 3/3/2021) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FINASTRA USA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cassandra M Ferrannini