This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 07:38:05 (UTC).

Chavez v. Saul

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 Chavez filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Martin Reidinger and W. Carleton Metcalf. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00267

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martin Reidinger

Referral Judge

W. Carleton Metcalf

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charlene Chavez

Charlotte, NC 28205

Defendants

Nancy A. Berryhill

Andrew Saul

 

Court Documents

#7

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk shall deliver process to USM for service. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/12/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#6

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by USM as to Commissioner of Social Security served on 06/17/2019 (ctb) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by USM as to US Attorney General on 06/19/2019 (ctb) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • TEXT-ONLY Order of Referral - Social Security. Pursuant to the Standing Order 3:13MC95, 28 U.S.C. 636(b) and Local Civil Rule 72.1 this case is referred to a United States Magistrate Judge to make findings of fact, conclusions of law and to recommend disposition of any dispositive motion filed through submission of a Memorandum and Recommendation to the District Judge. Case referred to Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Entered by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 7/1/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(khm) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by USM as to Andrew Saul. US Attorney served on 6/12/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (cb) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to Andrew Saul, US Attorney and US Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Forms) (tmg) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk shall deliver process to USM for service. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/12/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charlene Chavez. (brj) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Pro Se COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Charlene Chavez.(brj) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.