This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/18/2022 at 17:09:35 (UTC).

Chavez v. Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company

Case Summary

On 02/04/2022 Chavez filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony J. Battaglia and Allison H. Goddard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00166

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anthony J. Battaglia

Referral Judge

Allison H. Goddard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Minerva Chavez

Defendant

Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Chloe A. Raimey

Attorney at Nichols Kaster PLLP

80 South 8Th Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Manfred P. Muecke

Attorney at Manfred, APC

600 Broadway Avenue, Suite 700

San Diego, CA 92101

Matthew Hale Morgan

Attorney at Nichols Kaster PLLP

4700 Ids Center

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Robert L. Schug

Attorney at Nichols Kaster PLLP

80 South Eighth Street, 4700 Ids Center

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Teresa M. Becvar

Attorney at Stephan Zouras, LLP

100 North Riverside Plaza, Suite 2150

Chicago, IL 60606

James B. Zouras

Attorney at Stephan Zouras, LLP

205 North Michigan Avenue, Suite 2560

Chicago, IL 60601

Ryan F Stephan

Attorney at Stephan, Zouras, LLP

100 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 2150

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorneys

Amir Nassihi

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon L. L. P.

555 Mission Street, Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Anitra R. Clement

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon L. L. P.

100 North Tampa Street, Suite 2900

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

20 #1

Declaration In Support Of Joint Motion

20 #20

Main Document

#18

(#18) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16810280.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Morgan, Matthew) (rmc). (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#16

(#16) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16810079.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Raimey, Chloe) (rmc). (Entered: 05/10/2022)

14 #2

Exhibit A

14 #1

Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Dismiss

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Party with Financial Interest and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company (Clement, Anitra) (jrm). (Entered: 04/05/2022)

#12

(#12) ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Anitra R. Clement (Re: ECF No. #11 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/31/2022.(jrd) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER Granting in Part Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company answer due 5/5/2022. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/29/2022. (jrm) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#9

(#9) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company. (Nassihi, Amir)Attorney Amir Nassihi added to party Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company(pty:dft) (jrm). (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Chavez. Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company served. (Muecke, Manfred) (jrm). (Entered: 03/23/2022)

#6

(#6) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $213.00 receipt number ACASDC-16598540.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Becvar, Teresa)(jrd) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#4

(#4) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16583856.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Stephan, Ryan) (rmc). (Entered: 02/21/2022)

#3

(#3) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16583799.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Zouras, James) (rmc). (Entered: 02/21/2022)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smy1)(jrd) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Minerva Chavez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support Of Joint Motion)(Muecke, Manfred)(ave). (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • Docket(#19) PRO HAC APPROVED: Matthew Hale Morgan appearing for Plaintiff Minerva Chavez (no document attached) (rmc) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16810280.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Morgan, Matthew) (rmc). (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • Docket(#17) PRO HAC APPROVED: Chloe A. Raimey appearing for Plaintiff Minerva Chavez (no document attached) (rmc) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16810079.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Raimey, Chloe) (rmc). (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : Responses due by 5/19/2022; Replies due by 5/26/2022; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion Hearing set for 7/7/2022 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia.(no document attached) (sc) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A)(Nassihi, Amir) (jpp). (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Party with Financial Interest and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company (Clement, Anitra) (jrm). (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Anitra R. Clement (Re: ECF No. #11 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/31/2022.(jrd) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16695726.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Clement, Anitra) (rmc). (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER Granting in Part Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company answer due 5/5/2022. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/29/2022. (jrm) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company. (Nassihi, Amir)Attorney Amir Nassihi added to party Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company(pty:dft) (jrm). (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minerva Chavez. Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company served. (Muecke, Manfred) (jrm). (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • Docket(#7) PRO HAC APPROVED: Teresa M. Becvar appearing for Plaintiff Minerva Chavez (no document attached) (jrd) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $213.00 receipt number ACASDC-16598540.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Becvar, Teresa)(jrd) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • Docket(#5) PRO HAC APPROVED: James B. Zouras, Ryan F Stephan appearing for Plaintiff Minerva Chavez (no document attached) (rmc) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16583856.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Stephan, Ryan) (rmc). (Entered: 02/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-16583799.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Zouras, James) (rmc). (Entered: 02/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smy1)(jrd) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ACASDC-16540918.), filed by Minerva Chavez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:22-cv-166-AJB-AHG. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case. (Schug, Robert)(smy1)(jrd) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLSTATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF JOSE GUTIERREZ is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anitra R. Clement

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amir M Nassihi