This case was last updated from PACER on 11/17/2020 at 08:06:52 (UTC).

Chavez et al v. FCA US LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 Chavez filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roger T. Benitez and William V. Gallo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01813

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roger T. Benitez

Referral Judge

William V. Gallo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Angelica Chavez

Maja Chavez

Defendants

Does 1 through 10

FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark Romano

Attorney at Romano Stancroff PC

360 N. Pacific Coast Hwy., Suite 1010

El Segundo, CA 90245

Defendant Attorney

Kyle Anthony Fellenz

Attorney at Clark Hill LLP

600 W. Broadway, Suite 500

San Diego, CA 92101-3357

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER Vacating Telephonic Pre-Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Video Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; and Video Case Management Conference and Setting Telephonic Joint Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 11/02/2020.(djk) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Settlement by Maja Chavez (Romano, Mark) (mme). (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) ORDER Resetting Video Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Video Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/26/2020.(djk) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#6

(#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Maja Chavez. (Romano, Mark) (mme). (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#5

(#5) AMENDED NOTICE AND ORDER for Video Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Video Case Management Conference; and Telephonic Pre-Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/23/2020.(djk) Modified text on 9/23/2020 per Judge Gallo chambers (jmo). (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCA US LLC identifying Corporate Parent FCA US LLC, Other Affiliate Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V., Other Affiliate FCA North America Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate FCA Holdco B.V. for FCA US LLC.. (Fellenz, Kyle) (mme). (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by FCA US LLC. (rmc) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

1 #8

Declaration

1 #7

Declaration

1 #6

Exhibit E - State Court Answer

1 #5

Exhibit D - State Court POS of Summons

1 #4

Exhibit C - State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit B - State Court Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit A - State Court Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-02020-28910-CU-BC-CTL. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACASDC-14533571.), filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Summons, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit D - State Court POS of Summons, #6 Exhibit E - State Court Answer, #7 Declaration, #8 Declaration)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1813-BEN-WVG. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case.(rmc) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER Vacating Telephonic Pre-Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Video Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; and Video Case Management Conference and Setting Telephonic Joint Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 11/02/2020.(djk) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Settlement by Maja Chavez (Romano, Mark) (mme). (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Maja Chavez (Romano, Mark) (mme). (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Resetting Video Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Video Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/26/2020.(djk) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Maja Chavez. (Romano, Mark) (mme). (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED NOTICE AND ORDER for Video Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Video Case Management Conference; and Telephonic Pre-Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/23/2020.(djk) Modified text on 9/23/2020 per Judge Gallo chambers (jmo). (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/23/2020.(djk) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCA US LLC identifying Corporate Parent FCA US LLC, Other Affiliate Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V., Other Affiliate FCA North America Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate FCA Holdco B.V. for FCA US LLC.. (Fellenz, Kyle) (mme). (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by FCA US LLC. (rmc) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-02020-28910-CU-BC-CTL. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACASDC-14533571.), filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Summons, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit D - State Court POS of Summons, #6 Exhibit E - State Court Answer, #7 Declaration, #8 Declaration)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1813-BEN-WVG. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case.(rmc) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kyle Anthony Fellenz