This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/20/2022 at 08:16:03 (UTC).

Chavez, et al. v. Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/21/2022 Chavez filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00176

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Greg Chavez

Orion Aviation, LLC.

Defendant

Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua S Evett

Attorney at Duke Evett PLLC

1087 W. River Street, Suite 300

Boise, ID 83707

Mallam John Prior

Defendant Attorneys

Kevin Alan Griffiths

Attorney at Scanlan Griffiths Aldridge Nickels

913 W. River Street, Suite 310

Boise, ID 83702

Kevin J Scanlan

Attorney at Scanlan Griffiths Aldridge Nickels

913 W. River Street, Suite 310

Boise, ID 83702

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Summons

1 #2

Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company.(Griffiths, Kevin)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allianz of America, Inc, Corporate Parent Allianz SE, Other Affiliate AGCS International Holding B.V. for Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company. (Griffiths, Kevin)

#5

(#5) LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - On or before Monday, July 18, 2022, the parties must file with the Court the JOINT Litigation Plan and Discovery Plans. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2022 10:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 7 before Judge Raymond Edward Patricco Jr. Signed by Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Greg Chavez, Orion Aviation, LLC and counsel for Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company. re #1 Complaint and #3 Answer to Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 7/25/2022. (jd)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Greg Chavez, Orion Aviation, LLC.. (Evett, Joshua)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Greg Chavez, Orion Aviation, LLC.. (Evett, Joshua)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketNOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Greg Chavez, Orion Aviation, LLC and counsel for Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company. re #1 Complaint and #3 Answer to Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 7/25/2022. (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - On or before Monday, July 18, 2022, the parties must file with the Court the JOINT Litigation Plan and Discovery Plans. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2022 10:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 7 before Judge Raymond Edward Patricco Jr. Signed by Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allianz of America, Inc, Corporate Parent Allianz SE, Other Affiliate AGCS International Holding B.V. for Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company. (Griffiths, Kevin)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company.(Griffiths, Kevin)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIDDC-2382592.), filed by Greg Chavez. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Cover Sheet)(Evett, Joshua)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE CO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin Alan Griffiths

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin J Scanlan