This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/16/2022 at 07:23:51 (UTC).

Chauvin v. ABB, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 03/17/2022 Chauvin filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ABB, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Greg Gerard Guidry and Karen Wells Roby. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00696

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Greg Gerard Guidry

Referral Judge

Karen Wells Roby

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ronald J. Chauvin

Defendants

General Electric Company

International Paper Company

Montello, Inc.

Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.

Texaco, Inc.

51 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lindsey A. Cheek

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2310

New Orleans, LA 70130

Jeanne Arceneaux

Attorney at Kelley Kronenberg

201 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 2500

New Orleans, LA 70170

Kelsey Early

Attorney at Vinson Law PA

5505 West Gray St.

Tampa, FL 33609

Defendant Attorneys

John Joseph Hainkel, III

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Angela M. Bowlin

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Elizabeth Riddell Penn

Attorney at Forman Watkins & Krutz LLP

201 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Etienne Francis Rene

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, Haas, Radecker & Carey (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Tim D. Gray

Attorney at Forman, Watkins & Krutz LLP (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Chelsea Elizabeth Gaudin

Attorney at Forman, Watkins & Krutz LLP (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

McCann Elizabeth LeFeve

Attorney at Forman, Watkins & Krutz LLP (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Melissa Desormeaux Fuller

Attorney at Forman, Watkins & Krutz LLP (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Michael H. Abraham

Attorney at Forman, Watkins & Krutz LLP (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Peter Andersen Moir

Attorney at Forman Watkins & Krutz, LLP

201 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Trey Michael Williams, I

Attorney at Forman, Watkins, & Krutz, LLP

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Natasha Amber Corb

Attorney at MG+M The Law Firm (New Orleans)

365 Canal Street, Suite 3000

New Orleans, LA 70130

Other Attorneys

Margaret M. Joffe

Attorney at Cosmich Simmons & Brown, PLLC

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2215

New Orleans, LA 70130

Douglas R. Elliott

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, LLC (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Jamie Hebert Baglio

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, LLC (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Kenan Slade Rand, Jr

Attorney at Cosmich Simmons & Brown, PLLC

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2215

New Orleans, LA 70130

Shelley L. Thompson

Attorney at Cosmich Simmons & Brown

650 Poydras Street, Ste 2215

New Orleans, LA 70130

85 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#65

(#65) DEFICIENT: Amendment/Supplement to Document by Ronald J. Chauvin re 49 Stipulation of Dismissal Proposed Order (Early, Kelsey) Modified text/removed linkage on 5/10/2022 (mm). (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#62

(#62) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by International Paper Company identifying corporate parent T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc. for International Paper Company. (Penn, Elizabeth) Modified text/added corporate parent on 5/9/2022 (mm). (Entered: 05/09/2022)

61 #2

Proposed Order

61 #1

Proposed Order

61 #61

Main Document

#60

(#60) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Anco Insulations Inc (Rand, Kenan) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#58

(#58) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Montello, Inc. (Foundas, Ernest) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#57

(#57) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Union Carbide Corporation identifying corporate parent Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation. (Foundas, Ernest) Modified text/added corporate parent on 5/3/2022 (mm). (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#54

(#56) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #54 Statement of Corporate Disclosure, #53 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Document contains incorrect Section letter and Magistrate Judge number. All future pleadings must reflect Section T and Magistrate Judge (4). (mm) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

1 #26

State Court Pleadings Part 18

1 #25

State Court Pleadings Part 17

1 #24

State Court Pleadings Part 16

1 #22

State Court Pleadings Part 14

1 #14

State Court Pleadings Part 6

1 #12

State Court Pleadings Part 4

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

118 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) DEFICIENT: Amendment/Supplement to Document by Ronald J. Chauvin re 49 Stipulation of Dismissal Proposed Order (Early, Kelsey) Modified text/removed linkage on 5/10/2022 (mm). (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #62 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not enter T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc. as a corporate parent(s) at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #61 MOTION for Protective Order. **Document lists counsel of record, Danielle M. Sczesny, but the database shows the attorney's name to be Danielle M.S. Riera. All future documents must reflect the corrected name or if the name in the court system is incorrect, attorney needs to have that changed.** (mm) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by International Paper Company identifying corporate parent T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc. for International Paper Company. (Penn, Elizabeth) Modified text/added corporate parent on 5/9/2022 (mm). (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Protective Order by Ronald J. Chauvin, Boeing Company. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order)(Corb, Natasha) (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/10/2022) (caa). (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Anco Insulations Inc (Rand, Kenan) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #57 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney should have entered the Corporate Parent at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Montello, Inc. (Foundas, Ernest) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Union Carbide Corporation identifying corporate parent Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation. (Foundas, Ernest) Modified text/added corporate parent on 5/3/2022 (mm). (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #54 Statement of Corporate Disclosure, #53 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Document contains incorrect Section letter and Magistrate Judge number. All future pleadings must reflect Section T and Magistrate Judge (4). (mm) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. **Corrected Civil Cover Sheet was subsequently provided to Clerk and has been attached to the filing.** (mm) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) EXPARTE/CONSENT JOINT MOTION to Dismiss Party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Ronald J. Chauvin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Jalenak, Jay) Modified filers on 3/21/2022 (mm). Modified on 3/21/2022 (mm). (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying corporate parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Jalenak, Jay) Modified text/added corporate parent on 3/23/2022 (mm). (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Boeing Company re #1 Notice of Removal to State Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Removal & Exhibits)(Corb, Natasha) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) **WITHDRAWN PER ORDER AT REC. DOC. 46** MOTION to Dismiss For Insufficient Service of Process by Boeing Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Proposed Order, #9 Notice of Submission)(Corb, Natasha) Modified text on 4/13/2022 (mm). (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Boeing Company (Corb, Natasha) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Boeing Company re #1 Notice of Removal to Plaintiff's Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Removal & Exhibits)(Corb, Natasha) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Compliance by Boeing Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Corb, Natasha) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Pairsh, case number 21-07662 D-12 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9279074) filed by Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleading Petition for Damages-Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 State Court Pleadings Part 1, #10 State Court Pleadings Part 2, #11 State Court Pleadings Part 3, #12 State Court Pleadings Part 4, #13 State Court Pleadings Part 5, #14 State Court Pleadings Part 6, #15 State Court Pleadings Part 7, #16 State Court Pleadings Part 8, #17 State Court Pleadings Part 9, #18 State Court Pleadings Part 10, #19 State Court Pleadings Part 11, #20 State Court Pleadings Part 12, #21 State Court Pleadings Part 13, #22 State Court Pleadings Part 14, #23 State Court Pleadings Part 15, #24 State Court Pleadings Part 16, #25 State Court Pleadings Part 17, #26 State Court Pleadings Part 18) Attorney Natasha Amber Corb added to party Boeing Company(pty:dft).(Corb, Natasha) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/18/2022) (mm). (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MONTELLO, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TEXACO INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where General Electric International Operations Company, Inc. is a litigant