Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/13/2021 at 11:11:36 (UTC).

CHAUDHRY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 CHAUDHRY filed an Other lawsuit against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy Berman Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01041

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amy Berman Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAFAH CHAUDHRY

Defendants

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY

UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE

ANTONY J. BLINKEN

U.S. CONSULATE, ISLAMABAD, PAKISTAN

TRACY RENAUD

ANGELA AGGELER

ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS

U.S. CONSULATE

ANTONY BLINKEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James O. Hacking, III

Attorney at HACKING LAW PRACTICE, LLC

10900 Manchester Road, Suite 203

St. Louis, MO 63122

 

Court Documents

1 #11

Summons

1 #10

Summons

1 #9

Summons

1 #8

Summons

1 #7

Summons

1 #6

Summons

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8375287) filed by SAFAH CHAUDHRY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(Hacking, James) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ANGELA AGGELER served on 4/26/2021; ANTONY BLINKEN served on 4/26/2021; ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS served on 4/26/2021; TRACY RENAUD served on 4/26/2021; U.S. CONSULATE served on 4/26/2021; UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 4/26/2021; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 4/26/2021; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 4/26/2021, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/26/2021., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/26/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/25/2021.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hacking, James) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS (10) Issued Electronically as to ANGELA AGGELER, ANTONY J. BLINKEN, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, TRACY RENAUD, U.S. CONSULATE, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (znmg) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8375287) filed by SAFAH CHAUDHRY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(Hacking, James) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. CONSULATE, ISLAMABAD, PAKISTAN is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James O. Hacking, III