This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:18:09 (UTC).

Chau v. SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Chau filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nathaniel M. Gorton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-12473

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nathaniel M. Gorton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dine Chau

Lawrence, MA 01840

Defendants

SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC.

U.S. Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marc W. Potvin

Attorney at Northeast Justice Center

50 Island Street, Suite 203B

Lawrence, MA 01840

Defendant Attorneys

Donald W. Seeley, Jr.

Attorney at Parker Ibrahim & Berg LLP

2 Oliver Street, Suite 405

Boston, MA 02109

Jeffrey D. Adams

Attorney at Parker Ibrahim & Berg, LLP

2 Oliver Street, 4Th Floor

Boston, MA 02109

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 7, 2020 to Respond to Motion to Dismiss Complaint by Dine Chau.(Potvin, Marc) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

11 #37

Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 24

11 #36

Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 23

11 #35

Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 22.A-B

11 #34

Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 21

11 #33

Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 20

11 #32

Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 19

11 #31

Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 18

11 #30

Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 17

11 #9

Exhibit Pl's Aff. Ex. 6

11 #8

Exhibit Pl's Aff. Ex. 5

11 #7

Exhibit Pl's Aff. Ex. 4

11 #6

Exhibit Pl's Aff. Ex. 3

11 #5

Exhibit Pl's Aff. Ex. 2

11 #4

Exhibit Pl's Aff. Ex. 1

11 #3

Affidavit Plaintiff's Affidavit

11 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed TRO/PI

11 #1

Supplement Original Motion for TRO/PI

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #18 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 7, 2020 to Respond to Motion to Dismiss Complaint. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 7, 2020 to Respond to Motion to Dismiss Complaint by Dine Chau.(Potvin, Marc) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Withdrawal of motion: #11 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction filed by Dine Chau.. (Potvin, Marc) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Seeley, Donald) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 1/24/2020) by SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Seeley, Donald) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #13 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to January 10, 2020. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to January 10, 2020 to ENLARGE RESPONSE DEADLINES by SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., U.S. Bank, N.A..(Seeley, Donald) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Set/Reset Deadlines as to #11 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 12:00 PM 12/31/2019 (Lima, Christine) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction by Dine Chau. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Original Motion for TRO/PI, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed TRO/PI, #3 Affidavit Plaintiff's Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Pl's Aff. Ex. 1, #5 Exhibit Pl's Aff. Ex. 2, #6 Exhibit Pl's Aff. Ex. 3, #7 Exhibit Pl's Aff. Ex. 4, #8 Exhibit Pl's Aff. Ex. 5, #9 Exhibit Pl's Aff. Ex. 6, #10 Exhibit Pl's Aff. Ex. 7, #11 Exhibit Pl's Aff. Ex. 8, #12 Exhibit Pl's Aff. Ex. 9, #13 Affidavit Plaintiff Counsel Affidavit, #14 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 1, #15 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 2, #16 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 3, #17 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 4.A-C, #18 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 5, #19 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 6, #20 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 7, #21 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 8, #22 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 9, #23 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 10, #24 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 11, #25 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 12, #26 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 13, #27 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 14, #28 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 15, #29 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 16, #30 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 17, #31 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 18, #32 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 19, #33 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 20, #34 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 21, #35 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 22.A-B, #36 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 23, #37 Exhibit Counsel Aff. Ex. 24)(Potvin, Marc) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey D. Adams on behalf of SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., U.S. Bank, N.A. (Adams, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Response due by 12/30/2019. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Seeley, Donald) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Seeley, Donald) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/30/2019 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint , Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/30/2019 to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint ( Responses due by 12/23/2019) by SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., U.S. Bank, N.A..(Seeley, Donald) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Donald W. Seeley, Jr on behalf of SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., U.S. Bank, N.A. (Seeley, Donald) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(#4) Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal,, Exhibit A to Notice of Removal by SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Part 2 continued)(Seeley, Donald) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/9/2019) to upload redacted documents at request of counsel (Vieira, Leonardo). (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/9/2019) to upload redacted documents at request of counsel (Vieira, Leonardo). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee, on behalf of the holders of the J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-WMC3 Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-WMC3 ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8002677 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Category Form)(Seeley, Donald). Modified on 12/6/2019: Replaced civil cover sheet and category form to flatten file (Kelly, Danielle). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.