This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:48:28 (UTC).

Chatman et al v. Sheldon G. Perl et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Chatman filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Sheldon G Perl. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03357

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca R. Pallmeyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jasmine Chatman

Breeuna Smith

Defendants

Pangea Ventures, LLC

Brian Ziolkowski

Sheldon G. Perl

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Jacob Wood

Attorney at Community Lawyers Group, Ltd.

20 N. Clark Street, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Celetha Chatman

Attorney at Community Lawyers Group, Ltd.

20 N Clark Street, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas Gerald Cronin

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

1 N. Franklin Street, Suite 800

Chicago, IL 60606

Angelo John Kappas

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

One North Franklin, Suite 800

Chicago, IL 60606

Christina Rose Spiezia

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

One North Franklin Street, Suite 800

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Motion by Christina Rose Spiezia for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #11 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/27/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Spiezia, Christina) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Jasmine Chatman, Breeuna Smith; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15840725. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit s A-E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wood, Michael) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Pangea Ventures, LLC (Spiezia, Christina) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Jasmine Chatman, Breeuna Smith by Celetha Chatman (Chatman, Celetha) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Brian Ziolkowski, Pangea Ventures, LLC, Sheldon G. Perl by Christina Rose Spiezia (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Spiezia, Christina) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jasmine Chatman, Breeuna Smith as to Sheldon G. Perl on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Chatman, Celetha) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#11

(#11) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Brian Ziolkowski, Pangea Ventures, LLC, Sheldon G. Perl (Spiezia, Christina) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#13

(#13) EXHIBIT by Defendants Brian Ziolkowski, Pangea Ventures, LLC, Sheldon G. Perl regarding MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Brian Ziolkowski, Pangea Ventures, LLC, Sheldon G. Perl #11 (Spiezia, Christina) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#14

(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion hearing held on 6/27/2019. Defendants' motion to dismiss #11 is entered and continued for briefing. Response to be filed by or on 7/25/2019; reply to be filed by or on 8/15/2019; ruling set for 8/21/2019 at 9:30 AM. Initial status hearing set for 7/22/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice. (etv, ) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Jasmine Chatman, Breeuna Smith by Michael Jacob Wood (Wood, Michael) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

7 #1

Certificate of Service

#6

(#6) PRO SE Appearance by Defendant Sheldon G. Perl. (tt, ) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit s A-E

9 #1

Certificate of Service

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion hearing held on 6/27/2019. Defendants' motion to dismiss #11 is entered and continued for briefing. Response to be filed by or on 7/25/2019; reply to be filed by or on 8/15/2019; ruling set for 8/21/2019 at 9:30 AM. Initial status hearing set for 7/22/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice. (etv, ) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) EXHIBIT by Defendants Brian Ziolkowski, Pangea Ventures, LLC, Sheldon G. Perl regarding MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Brian Ziolkowski, Pangea Ventures, LLC, Sheldon G. Perl #11 (Spiezia, Christina) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Motion by Christina Rose Spiezia for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #11 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/27/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Spiezia, Christina) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Brian Ziolkowski, Pangea Ventures, LLC, Sheldon G. Perl (Spiezia, Christina) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Pangea Ventures, LLC (Spiezia, Christina) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Brian Ziolkowski, Pangea Ventures, LLC, Sheldon G. Perl by Christina Rose Spiezia (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Spiezia, Christina) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Brian Ziolkowski, Pangea Ventures, LLC, Sheldon G. Perl by Angelo John Kappas (Kappas, Angelo) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Brian Ziolkowski, Pangea Ventures, LLC, Sheldon G. Perl by Thomas Gerald Cronin (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cronin, Thomas) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PRO SE Appearance by Defendant Sheldon G. Perl. (tt, ) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jasmine Chatman, Breeuna Smith as to Sheldon G. Perl on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Chatman, Celetha) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Brian Ziolkowski (rc, ) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Pangea Ventures, LLC, Sheldon G. Perl. (ew, ) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 7/22/2019 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, ) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Jasmine Chatman, Breeuna Smith by Celetha Chatman (Chatman, Celetha) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Jasmine Chatman, Breeuna Smith by Michael Jacob Wood (Wood, Michael) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Jasmine Chatman, Breeuna Smith; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15840725. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit s A-E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wood, Michael) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.