This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 10:13:31 (UTC).

Chartwell Staffing Services Inc. v. Atlantic Solutions Group Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2019 Chartwell Staffing Services Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Atlantic Solutions Group Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John D. Early and Josephine L. Staton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-00642

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John D. Early

Presiding Judge

Josephine L. Staton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chartwell Staffing Services Inc., a New York corporation

Defendants

Cathy Clark, an individual

Marlene Cornejo, an individual

Denise Gonzalez, an individual

Atlantic Solutions Group Inc., a Delaware corporation, doing business as Empire Workforce Solutions

Does 1 though 10, inclusive

Tony Alanis, an individual

Patricia Hanks, an individual

Jamie Diaz, an individual

Nick Rebultan, an individual

Rosa Benavides, an individual

Ivettelis Nieves, an individual

Kevin Case, an individual

Adam Kidan, an individual

Denise Gonzalez

Marlene Cornejo

Ivettelis Nieves

Atlantic Solutions Group Inc.

Kevin Case

Patricia Hanks

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Traci G Choi

Attorney at Bryan Cave LLP

3161 Michelson Drive Suite 1500

Irvine, CA 92612

Defendant Attorney

Damion D D Robinson

Attorney at Affeld Grivakes LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 2460

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Other Attorneys

Aileen Marie Hunter

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP

3161 Michelson Drive Suite 1500

Irvine, CA 92612

Kristin Suzanne Webb

Attorney at Byan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP

3161 Michelson Drive Suite 1500

Irvine, CA 92612-4414

Richard C Macias

Attorney at Maynard Cooper and Gale LLP

1901 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#75

#74

51 #4

Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw

51 #3

Declaration Declaration of David Affeld ISO Motion to Disqualify

51 #2

Declaration Declaration of Haynes Dallas ISO Motion to Disqualify

51 #1

Declaration Declaration of Adam Kidan ISO Motion to Disqualify

#51

43 #3

Proposed Order

#43

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Attachment 1 to Summons

#2

#1

162 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #74 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kristin Suzanne Webb on behalf of Plaintiff Chartwell Staffing Services Inc. (Attorney Kristin Suzanne Webb added to party Chartwell Staffing Services Inc.(pty:pla))(Webb, Kristin) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#73) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING HEARINGS: On the Court's own motion, the hearings for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss/Strike #43 , Motion to Disqualify #51 , and Motion to Compel Arbitration [Doc. 72] are CONTINUED to 9/13/2019 at 10:30 a.m. before Judge Josephine L. Staton. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#72) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendants Tony Alanis, Atlantic Solutions Group Inc., Jamie Diaz, Patricia Hanks, Adam Kidan. Motion set for hearing on 9/6/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Damion Robinson ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration, #2 Declaration Declaration of Marlene Cornejo ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration, #3 Declaration Declaration of Patricia Hanks ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration, #4 Declaration Declaration of Tony Alanis ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration, #5 Declaration Declaration of Rose Benavides ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration, #6 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration, #7 Proposed Warrant [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Compel Arbitration) (Robinson, Damion) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#71) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No. 3 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Case is ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than March 13, 2020. (tg) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#70) CIVIL TRIAL ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton. (tg) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#69) MINUTES (In Chambers) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for hearing 7/5/2019, is VACATED and the following schedule is set. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/15/2020 at 10:30 AM. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). (jp) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#68) ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #60 filed by Patricia Hanks, Adam Kidan, Atlantic Solutions Group Inc., Tony Alanis, Jamie Diaz. CCA # 19-55614. Appellant's motion to stay the district court's May 20, 2019 order pending appeal is denied. Appellee's motion to seal at Docket Entry No. 19 will be addressed by separate order. (mat) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#67) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-4 weeks, filed by Plaintiff Chartwell Staffing Services Inc... (Choi, Traci) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#66) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS BY JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON OVERRULING DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO UNDERTAKING (tg) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff Chartwell Staffing Services Inc.. Related Case(s): 8:19-cv-00639 DOC (ADSx) (Choi, Traci) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Tony Alanis, Atlantic Solutions Group Inc., Rosa Benavides, Kevin Case, Cathy Clark, Marlene Cornejo. (jtil) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (jtil) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Chartwell Staffing Services Inc., a New York corporation, identifying Plaintiff Chartwell Staffing Services Inc, a New York corporation; Defendant ATLANTIC SOLUTIONS GROUP INC., a Delaware corporation, doing business as EMPIRE WORKFORCE SOLUTIONS; Defendant Adam Kidan, an individual; Defendant Tony Alanis, an individual; Defendant Rosa Benavides, an individual; Defendant Kevin Case, an individual; Defendant Cathy Clark, an individual; Defendant Marlene Cornejo, an individual; Defendant Jamie Diaz, an individual; Defendant Denise Gonzales, an individual; Defendant Patricia Hanks, an individual; Defendant Ivettelis Nieves, an individual; Defendant Nick Rebultan, an individual. (Choi, Traci) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Chartwell Staffing Services Inc., a New York corporation (Choi, Traci) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Chartwell Staffing Services Inc., a New York corporation. (Choi, Traci) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Chartwell Staffing Services Inc., a New York corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 to Summons)(Choi, Traci) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23498933 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Chartwell Staffing Services Inc., a New York corporation. (Attorney Traci G Choi added to party Chartwell Staffing Services Inc., a New York corporation(pty:pla))(Choi, Traci) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ATLANTIC SOLUTIONS GROUP, INC., a Delaware corporation, DBA Empire Workforce Solutions is a litigant

Latest cases where CHARTWELL STAFFING SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aileen Marie Hunter Esquire