This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/12/2022 at 07:20:32 (UTC).

Charming Beats LLC v. Townsquare Media, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/13/2022 Charming Beats LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Townsquare Media, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian M. Cogan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01379

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian M. Cogan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charming Beats LLC

Defendants

Townsquare Media, Inc.

Open Culture LLC

Culture Map, LLC

BuzzFeed, Inc.

Group Nine Media, Inc.

Good Worldwide, Inc.

Davler Media Group LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard M. Garbarini

Attorney at Garbarini FitzGerald P.C.

250 Park Avenue, 7Th Floor

New York, NY 10177

 

Court Documents

15 #1

Electronic entry terminating civil case

15 #15

Main Document

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Charming Beats LLC Without Prejudice (Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

13 #2

copyright registration

13 #1

complaint

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Status Conference is set for 4/26/2022 at 3:00 pm. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852 followed by access code 6427877#. When the conference begins parties will be prompted to input the security code 1379#. See attached mandatory requirements for the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/14/2022. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#11

(#11) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#10

(#10) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#9

(#9) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Charming Beats LLC (Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 03/13/2022)

#8

(#8) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Charming Beats LLC (Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 03/13/2022)

#7

(#7) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Charming Beats LLC (Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 03/13/2022)

#6

(#6) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Charming Beats LLC (Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 03/13/2022)

#5

(#5) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Charming Beats LLC (Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 03/13/2022)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Charming Beats LLC (Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 03/13/2022)

1 #2

Exhibit Notice

1 #1

Exhibit Registrion and Assignment

1 #1

Main Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 Electronic entry terminating civil case) (Hong, Loan) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated as per plaintiff's Rule 41(a) notice. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/17/2022. (Cogan, Brian) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Charming Beats LLC Without Prejudice (Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 copyright registration) (Rocco, Christine) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Status Conference is set for 4/26/2022 at 3:00 pm. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852 followed by access code 6427877#. When the conference begins parties will be prompted to input the security code 1379#. See attached mandatory requirements for the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/14/2022. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketYour proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: If multiple defendants, there must me a rider attached to the summons with the name and addresses of all defendants included., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Charming Beats LLC (Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 03/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Charming Beats LLC (Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 03/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Charming Beats LLC (Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 03/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Charming Beats LLC (Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 03/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Charming Beats LLC (Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 03/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Charming Beats LLC (Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 03/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Charming Beats LLC (Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 03/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Charming Beats LLC (Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 03/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BuzzFeed, Inc., Culture Map, LLC, Open Culture LLC, Townsquare Media, Inc., Group Nine Media, Inc., Good Worldwide, Inc., Davler Media Group LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15371603 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Charming Beats LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Registrion and Assignment, #2 Exhibit Notice) (Garbarini, Richard) (Entered: 03/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Charming Beats LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Group Nine Media, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Townsquare Media, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BUZZFEED INC. is a litigant