This case was last updated from PACER on 12/08/2020 at 09:17:22 (UTC).

Charleston, City of v. Brabham Oil Company Inc et al

Case Summary

On 10/09/2020 Charleston, City of filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Brabham Oil Company Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Bruce Howe Hendricks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-03579

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Bruce Howe Hendricks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charleston, City of

Defendants

Chevron Corporation

Enmark Stations Inc

BP America Inc

Brabham Oil Company Inc

Piedmont Petroleum Corp

Royal Dutch Shell PLC

Shell Oil Products Company LLC

Murphy Oil USA Inc

Phillips 66

Marathon Petroleum Corporation

Colonial Pipeline Company

ConocoPhillips Company

Hess Corporation

Shell Oil Company

Colonial Group Inc

Phillips 66 Company

Marathon Petroleum Company LP

Murphy Oil Corporation

Exxonmobil Oil Corporation

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel S McQueeney, Jr

Attorney at Pratt-Thomas Walker

16 Charlotte Street

Charleston, SC 29403

Susan Jeanne Herdina

Attorney at City of Charleston

50 Broad Street

Charleston, SC 29401

Joseph P Griffith, Jr

Attorney at Joseph P Griffith Law Firm

Seven State Street

Charleston, SC 29401

Defendant Attorneys

Joel Haywood Smith

Attorney at Bowman and Brooke

1441 Main Street, Suite 1200

Columbia, SC 29201

John T Lay

Attorney at Gallivan White and Boyd

Po Box 7368, 1201 Main Street, Suite 1200

Columbia, SC 29202

Diana E Reiter

Attorney at Arnold and Porter Kay Scholer LLP

250 W 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019-9710

Joseph Calhoun Watson

Attorney at Robinson Gray Stepp and Laffitte LLC

1310 Gadsden Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Matthew T Heartney

Attorney at Arnold and Porter Kay Scholer LLP

777 South Figueroa Street, 44Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Daniel B Rogers

Attorney at Shook Hardy and Bacon LLP

201 S Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 3200

Miami, FL 33131

Tristan L Duncan

Attorney at Shook Hardy and Bacon LLP

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108

Shannon Suzanne Broome

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

50 California Street, Suite 1700

San Francisco, CA 94111

Shanon Nicole Peake

Attorney at Smith Robinson LLC

2530 Devine Street, Third Floor

Columbia, SC 29205

Jonathan M Robinson

Attorney at Smith Robinson LLC

2530 Devine Street, Third Floor

Columbia, SC 29205

Ann Marie Mortimer

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

550 South Hope Street, Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Daniel Robert Brody

Attorney at Bartlit Beck LLP

1801 Wewatta Street, Suite 1200

Denver, CO 80202

Jameson Reece Jones

Attorney at Bartlit Beck LLP

1801 Wewatta Street, Suite 1200

Denver, CO 80202

Jacob Scott Janoe

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

910 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

Virginia Rogers Floyd

Attorney at Hood Law Firm

Po Box 1508

Charleston, SC 29402

Caitlin E Grusauskas

Attorney at Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton and Garrison LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Robert H Hood, Jr

Attorney at Hood Law Firm

Po Box 1508

Charleston, SC 29402

39 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

76 #7

Exhibit Exhibit 6 - 09/09/2020 Order of U.S. District Court of Hawaii Denying De

76 #6

Exhibit Exhibit 5 - 08/21/2020 Order of U.S. District Court of Hawaii Lifting Li

76 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 4 - 11/16/2020 Brief for the Petitioners in BP P.L.C., et al. v.

76 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 3 - 03/31/2020 Petition for a Writ of Certiorari to the U.S. Sup

76 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 2 - 03/30/2020 Mandate of 4th Cir. Court of Appeals in Mayor and

76 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - 10/01/2019 Order of 4th Cir. Court of Appeals in Mayor and C

76 #1

Affidavit Declaration of Joseph P. Griffith, Jr.

#76

(#76) RESPONSE in Opposition re #59 Joint MOTION to Stay Response filed by Charleston, City of.Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/14/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Joseph P. Griffith, Jr., #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - 10/01/2019 Order of 4th Cir. Court of Appeals in Mayor and City Council of Baltimore v. BP P.L.C., et al., #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - 03/30/2020 Mandate of 4th Cir. Court of Appeals in Mayor and City Council of Baltimore v. BP P.L.C., et al., #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - 03/31/2020 Petition for a Writ of Certiorari to the U.S. Supreme Court in BP P.L.C., et al. v. Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - 11/16/2020 Brief for the Petitioners in BP P.L.C., et al. v. Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - 08/21/2020 Order of U.S. District Court of Hawaii Lifting Litigation Stay in City & County of Honolulu v. Sunoco LP, et al., #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - 09/09/2020 Order of U.S. District Court of Hawaii Denying Defendants' Request for Reconsideration of Stay in City & County of Honolulu v. Sunoco LP, et al.)(Griffith, Joseph) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#59

(#76) RESPONSE in Opposition re #59 Joint MOTION to Stay Response filed by Charleston, City of.Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/14/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Joseph P. Griffith, Jr., #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - 10/01/2019 Order of 4th Cir. Court of Appeals in Mayor and City Council of Baltimore v. BP P.L.C., et al., #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - 03/30/2020 Mandate of 4th Cir. Court of Appeals in Mayor and City Council of Baltimore v. BP P.L.C., et al., #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - 03/31/2020 Petition for a Writ of Certiorari to the U.S. Supreme Court in BP P.L.C., et al. v. Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - 11/16/2020 Brief for the Petitioners in BP P.L.C., et al. v. Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - 08/21/2020 Order of U.S. District Court of Hawaii Lifting Litigation Stay in City & County of Honolulu v. Sunoco LP, et al., #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - 09/09/2020 Order of U.S. District Court of Hawaii Denying Defendants' Request for Reconsideration of Stay in City & County of Honolulu v. Sunoco LP, et al.)(Griffith, Joseph) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

1 #51

Exhibit 49: CIA-RDP63-00313A000500130031-9

1 #13

Exhibit 11:G.S. Callendar,

1 #11

Exhibit 9:121 Cong. Rec. S903-11 (Jan. 27, 1975)

1 #10

Exhibit 8:1946 03 02 Elk Hills Report

1 #9

Exhibit 7:Lease (4)

1 #8

Exhibit 6:Lease (3)

1 #6

Exhibit 4:Lease (1)

1 #5

Exhibit 3:Elk Hills Reserve Oil Will Flow Again - NY Times

1 #4

Exhibit 2: LongInactive Oilfield Is Open for Now - NY Times

204 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) RESPONSE in Opposition re #59 Joint MOTION to Stay Response filed by Charleston, City of.Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/14/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Joseph P. Griffith, Jr., #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - 10/01/2019 Order of 4th Cir. Court of Appeals in Mayor and City Council of Baltimore v. BP P.L.C., et al., #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - 03/30/2020 Mandate of 4th Cir. Court of Appeals in Mayor and City Council of Baltimore v. BP P.L.C., et al., #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - 03/31/2020 Petition for a Writ of Certiorari to the U.S. Supreme Court in BP P.L.C., et al. v. Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - 11/16/2020 Brief for the Petitioners in BP P.L.C., et al. v. Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - 08/21/2020 Order of U.S. District Court of Hawaii Lifting Litigation Stay in City & County of Honolulu v. Sunoco LP, et al., #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - 09/09/2020 Order of U.S. District Court of Hawaii Denying Defendants' Request for Reconsideration of Stay in City & County of Honolulu v. Sunoco LP, et al.)(Griffith, Joseph) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Grace Wickersham Knofczynski ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9502248) by Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC. Response to Motion due by 12/15/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Grace Knofczynski, #2 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing of Grace Knofczynski, #3 Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Grace Knofczynski)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Thiem, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Steven Severson ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9502236) by Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC. Response to Motion due by 12/15/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Daniel Severson, #2 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing of Daniel Severson, #3 Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Daniel Severson)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Thiem, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Charles Frederick ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9502222) by Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC. Response to Motion due by 12/15/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of David Frederick, #2 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing of David Frederick, #3 Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Thiem, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brendan Jeremiah Crimmins ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9502188) by Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC. Response to Motion due by 12/15/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Brendan Crimmins, #2 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing of Brendan Crimmins, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Brendan Crimmins)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Thiem, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) TEXT ORDER granting #60 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; #61 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; #62 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; #63 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #64 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Nancy G. Milburn, Diana E. Reiter, Matthew Heartney, Jonathan W. Hughes and John Lombardo, who represent BP America Inc and BP PLC, are granted admission pro hac vice in this case. Entered at the Direction of The Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 11/24/2020.(vdru, ) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven Mark Bauer ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9487324) by ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, Phillips 66, Phillips 66 Company. Response to Motion due by 12/4/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission)No proposed order.(Casey, Alice) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Margaret A. Tough ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9487306) by ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, Phillips 66, Phillips 66 Company. Response to Motion due by 12/4/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission)No proposed order.(Casey, Alice) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gabriella Kapp ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9487282) by ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, Phillips 66, Phillips 66 Company. Response to Motion due by 12/4/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission)No proposed order.(Casey, Alice) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Victor Marc Sher ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9486827) by Charleston, City of. Response to Motion due by 12/4/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Griffith, Joseph) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Virginia Rogers Floyd on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corporation, Exxonmobil Oil Corporation (Floyd, Virginia) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert H Hood, Jr on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corporation, Exxonmobil Oil Corporation (Hood, Robert) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Hood Craig on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corporation, Exxonmobil Oil Corporation (Craig, Molly) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER granting #5 Joint Motion for Extension of Time: It is ordered that all Defendants that have been served or purportedly served in this action shall have until November 16, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint and the obligation to respond to Rule 26.01 Interrogatories shall be deferred until the Court has ruled on Plaintiffs anticipated motion to remand. Entered at the Direction of The Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 10/21/2020.(vdru, ) Modified to edit text per Chambers on 10/23/2020 (vdru, ). (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Anne Joyner on behalf of Colonial Group Inc, Enmark Stations Inc (Joyner, Lindsay) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Charleston County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Acknowledgement of Receipt of Filed Notice of Removal, #2 Certificate of Service)(Smith, Joel) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Chevron Corporation, Chevron USA Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/29/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Smith, Joel) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Calhoun Watson on behalf of Brabham Oil Company Inc (Watson, Joseph) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Chevron Corporation, Chevron USA Inc.(vdru, ) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-10-3975. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9399788), filed by Chevron USA Inc, Chevron Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1: State Court Docs Part 1, #3 Exhibit State Court Docs Part 2, #4 Exhibit 2: LongInactive Oilfield Is Open for Now - NY Times, #5 Exhibit 3:Elk Hills Reserve Oil Will Flow Again - NY Times, #6 Exhibit 4:Lease (1), #7 Exhibit 5:Lease (2), #8 Exhibit 6:Lease (3), #9 Exhibit 7:Lease (4), #10 Exhibit 8:1946 03 02 Elk Hills Report, #11 Exhibit 9:121 Cong. Rec. S903-11 (Jan. 27, 1975), #12 Exhibit 10: H.R. Doc. No. 93-406 (1974), #13 Exhibit 11:G.S. Callendar,, #14 Exhibit 12:W.K., How Industry May Change Climate, N.Y. Times (May 24, 1953), #15 Exhibit 13:Time Magazine, Invisible Blanket (May 25, 1953), #16 Exhibit 14:Washington Post, Industrial Gases Warming Up Earth, Physicist Notes H, #17 Exhibit 15:57 12 08 Teller Sees World Flooding Peril (Wash Post) A1, #18 Exhibit 16:Second Supplemental Appropriation Bill, 1956, #19 Exhibit 17:Daniel P. Moynihan, Memorandum (Sept. 17, 1969), #20 Exhibit 18:IPCC (1990) at 254, #21 Exhibit 19:IPCC (1995) at 22, #22 Exhibit 20:IPCC (2001) at 10, #23 Exhibit 21:U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Guide to Climate Change, #24 Exhibit 22:Gulf of Mex. Region, Prod. by Operator Ranked by Vol., #25 Exhibit 23:Hearings Before The Comm on Naval Affs of the House of Repres on Est, #26 Exhibit 24:Yergin_The Prize, #27 Exhibit 25:Hakes_Declaration of Energy Independence, #28 Exhibit 26:H.R. Rep. 95-590, #29 Exhibit 27:HCRCHCVX, #30 Exhibit 28:Grey Bowers Ltr, #31 Exhibit 29:Dear Operator Ltr from L. Denett (Dec 14, 1999), #32 Exhibit 30:US Dept of the Interior_Minerals Management Service (May 31, 2007), #33 Exhibit 31:History of the Petroleum Administration for War 1941-1945 (excerpts), #34 Exhibit 32:TX-76, #35 Exhibit 33:ertificate of Dissolution of War Emergency Pipelines, Inc. (Aug. 28, #36 Exhibit 34:4th Annual Rpt of the Activities of the Jt Comtt on Defense Prod at 1, #37 Exhibit 35:24_annual_rept, #38 Exhibit 36:S.J. Res. 176_Naval Petroleum Reserve Numbered 1, Elk Hills, Calif, #39 Exhibit 37: FUEL IS DIVERTED FOR THE MILITARY - The New York Times, #40 Exhibit 38:Gregory W. Pedlow & Donald E. Welzenbach, The Central Intelligence Ag, #41 Exhibit 39:CIA Doc. No. CIA-RDP90B00170R000100080001-5 (Aug 3, 1981), #42 Exhibit 40: 1994 Rich, Lockheed Skunk Works, #43 Exhibit 41: CIA Doc No. CIA-RDP67B00074R000500400016-2, Contract No. AF33(657)-85, #44 Exhibit 42:CIA-RDP67B00074R000500400012-6, #45 Exhibit 43:CIA-RDP67B00074R000500440005-0, #46 Exhibit 44:CIA RDP67B00074R000500450004-0, #47 Exhibit 45:CIA-RDP67B00074R000500440006-9, #48 Exhibit 46:CIA-RDP67B00074R000500430003-3, #49 Exhibit 47: CIA-RDP67B00074R000500420006-1, #50 Exhibit 48:CIA-RDP67, #51 Exhibit 49: CIA-RDP63-00313A000500130031-9, #52 Exhibit 50:Detail Specification Turbine Fuels, Aviation, Kerosene Types, #53 Exhibit 51:Engg Circ 1105-2-186, #54 Exhibit 52:ETL_1100, #55 Exhibit 53:Cong. Rec. S1157-65 (daily ed. Feb. 9, 2005) (statement of Sen. Mark, #56 Exhibit 54:House Report No. 94-1084 Part 1, #57 Exhibit 55:1942-08-12; Discipline for Non-Compliant Refiners, #58 Exhibit 56:Aircraft Fuels & Propellants, Rpt, #59 Exhibit 57:Military Aviation and the Environment Historical Trends, #60 Exhibit 58:Coordinating Research Councils Handbook of Aviation Fuel Prop, #61 Exhibit 59:1941-08-11; Ickes Davis Speech Transcript of Meeting (excerpt), #62 Exhibit 60:2020-10-08 Tesoro Contract RFP Exhibit Table (003), #63 Exhibit 61:1953.05.05.Charleston News and Courier, #64 Exhibit 62: 1959.05.30.Charleston evening Post, #65 Exhibit 63: History of Naval Petroleum Reserve No. 1, #66 Exhibit 64: Growing Blanket of Carbon Dioxide Raises Earths Temp, #67 Exhibit 65: Dept of Defenses Handbook Aerospace Fuels Cert, #68 Certificate of Service, #69 Supporting Documents Declaration of Joshua Dick).(vdru, ) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLONIAL GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where COLONIAL PIPELINE CO is a litigant

Latest cases where MURPHY OIL USA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ROYAL DUTCH SHELL PLC is a litigant