This case was last updated from PACER on 09/20/2020 at 11:07:39 (UTC).

Charles v. State of North Carolina

Case Summary

On 07/22/2020 Charles filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against State of North Carolina. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Martin Reidinger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00196

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martin Reidinger

 

Party Details

Petitioner

James Benjamin Charles

Tabor City, NC 28463

Respondent

State of North Carolina

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The filing fee of $5.00 was not received or application to proceed without payment of fees and affidavit was not submitted. Application or Fee due by 8/13/2020. (rth) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#2

(#2) MEMORANDUM OF LAW & ORDER as to James Benjamin Charles (1). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Defendant James Benjamin Charles' Pro Se Motion to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 120 is deemed a motion to vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2254 and is TRANSFERRED to the District Court for the Western District of North Carolina. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 7/20/2020 (transferred from U.S. District Court, District of Minnesota). (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(rth) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#1

(#1) Pro Se PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by James Benjamin Charles (transferred from U.S. District Court, District of Minnesota).(rth) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Received: $ 5.00, receipt number CHD061226 (tlj) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter from James Benjamin Charles with $5.00 check enclosed. Clerk forwarded to Charlotte for receipt. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(reh) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The filing fee of $5.00 was not received or application to proceed without payment of fees and affidavit was not submitted. Application or Fee due by 8/13/2020. (rth) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger. (rth) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MEMORANDUM OF LAW & ORDER as to James Benjamin Charles (1). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Defendant James Benjamin Charles' Pro Se Motion to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 120 is deemed a motion to vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2254 and is TRANSFERRED to the District Court for the Western District of North Carolina. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 7/20/2020 (transferred from U.S. District Court, District of Minnesota). (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(rth) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Pro Se PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by James Benjamin Charles (transferred from U.S. District Court, District of Minnesota).(rth) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less