This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2021 at 07:05:12 (UTC).

Charles et al v. Limetree Bay Refining, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2021 Charles filed a Property - Land lawsuit against Limetree Bay Refining, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virgin Islands District. The Judges overseeing this case are Wilma A. Lewis and George W. Cannon, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00260

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Wilma A. Lewis

Referral Judge

George W. Cannon, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Francis E. Charles

Theresa J Charles

Kingshill, VI 00851

Defendants

EIG Global Energy Partners, LLC

Freepoint Commodities, LLC

Arclight Capital Parnters, LLC

Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC

2162 Church Street

Christiansted, VI 00820

Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC

Limetree Bay Refining, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John K Dema

Attorney at Law Offices of John K. Dema, P.C.

1236 Strand Street, Suite 103

St Croix, VI 00820-5008

Defendant Attorneys

Adam Nicholas Marinelli

Attorney at Bolt Nagi PC

Merchant Financial Center 4608 Tutu Park Mall Suite 202

St. Thomas, VI 00802-1735

J. Daryl Dodson

Attorney at Moore, Dodson and Russell

Suite 310

St Thomas, VI 00802

Arthur Justin Herskowitz

Attorney at Stroock & Stroock & Lavan, LLP

180 Maiden Lane

New York, NY 10038

Francis Healy

Attorney at Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP

180 Maiden Lane

New York, NY 10038

Kanaan Le'Roy Wilhite

Attorney at MOORE DODSON & RUSSELL

5035 14A Norre Gade, Po Box 310

St.Thomas, VI 00802

Melvin Brosterman

Attorney at Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP

180 Maiden Lane

New York, NY 10038

Charles Edward Lockwood

Attorney at Nichols, Newman, Logan & Gray P.C.

1131 King St, Ste 24

Christiansted, VI 00820

Daniel T. Donovan

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Holly Trogdon

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Matthew Owen

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Xavier J Avery

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

609 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

Gregg R Kronenberger

Attorney at Dudley Newman Feuerzeig, LLP

1311 King Street, Suite 204

Christiansted, VI 00820

Carl A Beckstedt, III

Attorney at Beckstedt and Associate

2162 Church Street

Christiansted, VI 00820-4604

Robert J. Kuczynski

Attorney at Law Office Of Beckstedt & Associates

2162 Church Street

Christiansted, VI 00820

 

Court Documents

#48

47 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#47

#46

45 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#45

#44

#43

#42

41 #3

Exhibit Ex. C Order

41 #2

Exhibit Ex. B Motion

41 #1

Exhibit Ex. A Complaint

#41

#40

9 #6

Text of Proposed Order Proposed order

9 #5

Exhibit Affidavit of CEL

9 #4

Exhibit Application

9 #3

Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing

93 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) NOTICE of Appearance by Kanaan Le'Roy Wilhite on behalf of Defendant Freepoint Commodities, LLC (Wilhite, Kanaan) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) NOTICE to the Court Re: Continuation of Stay of Virgin Islands Class Action Suits by Limetree Bay Refining, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) ORDER (GWC) dated 8/9/2021 denying #45 Defendant EIG Global Energy Partners, LLC's Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation (KMD) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Defendant EIG Global Energy Partners, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Marinelli, Adam) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur Justin Herskowitz on behalf of Defendant Freepoint Commodities, LLC (Herskowitz, Arthur) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) NOTICE of Appearance by Francis Healy on behalf of Defendant Freepoint Commodities, LLC (Healy, Francis) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) NOTICE of Appearance by Melvin Brosterman on behalf of Defendant Freepoint Commodities, LLC (Brosterman, Melvin) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) NOTICE Re: 14 Day Stay by Limetree Bay Refining, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. B Motion, #3 Exhibit Ex. C Order) (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL GROUNDS FOR REMOVAL by Limetree Bay Refining, LLC, Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC, Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) OATH OF ADMISSION (GWC) Related Document: #25 for Melvin A. Brosterman. (TNS) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Mathew Owen(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-943659) by Defendant Arclight Capital Parnters, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit Application, #5 Exhibit Affidavit of CEL, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order) (Lockwood, Charles) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Daniel Donovan(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-943654) by Defendant Arclight Capital Parnters, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Application, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of CEL, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order) (Lockwood, Charles) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRYRe: #3 Notice of Appearance.Counsel needs to re-file using correct log in information, docket #3 was filed by Charles Lockwood, Esq, and attached document signed by Gregg Kronenberger, Esq. (TNS) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Arclight Capital Parnters, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Kronenberger, Gregg) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by John K Dema on behalf of Plaintiffs Francis E. Charles, Theresa J Charles (Dema, John) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Kuczynski on behalf of Defendants Limetree Bay Refining, LLC, Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC (Kuczynski, Robert) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Carl A Beckstedt, III on behalf of Defendants Limetree Bay Refining, LLC, Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Edward Lockwood on behalf of Defendant Arclight Capital Parnters, LLC (Lockwood, Charles) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Edward Lockwood on behalf of Defendant Arclight Capital Parnters, LLC (Lockwood, Charles) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Plaintiffs Francis E. Charles, Theresa J Charles from VI Superior Court, St Croix Division, case number SX-2021-CV-00413. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-942364)filed by Arclight Capital Parnters, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent to removal, #3 Exhibit Ex A - Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit Ex B - Notice of Service, #5 Exhibit Ex C - Notices of Appearance, #6 Exhibit Ex D - Other docket entries) (Kronenberger, Gregg) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Limetree Bay Ventures, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Limetree Bay Refining, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John K Dema