This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/31/2020 at 11:41:08 (UTC).

Charanza v. Bottom Line Restaurants, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/02/2020 Charanza filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Bottom Line Restaurants, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Pitman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00714

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Casey Charanza

Defendants

Temple-1941

Bottom Line Restaurants, Inc.

Temple-1941 doing business as IHOP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joel S. Shields

Attorney at Scanes & Routh, LLP

7901 Fish Pond Road, Suite 200, P.O. Box 20965

Waco, TX 76702

Michael L. Scanes

Attorney at Scanes & Routh, LLP

7901 Fish Pond Road, Suite 200, P.O. Box 20965

Waco, TX 76702-0965

Defendant Attorneys

Jay M. Wallace

Attorney at Bell Nunnally & Martin LLP

2323 Ross Ave, Suite 1900

Dallas, TX 75201

Katie R. Beaird

Attorney at Bell Nunnally & Martin LLP

2323 Ross Avenue, Suite 1900

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#11

#10

9 #2

Exhibit Exh.B-ROS_IHOP

9 #1

Exhibit Exh.A-ROS_Bottom_Line_Restaurants

#9

8 #2

Proposed Order

8 #1

Exhibit A - Answer

#8

#7

#6

#5

4 #1

Summons for Temple-1941, LLC

#4

#3

#2

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DEFENDANTS' ORIGINAL ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Bottom Line Restaurants, Inc., Temple-1941.(cj) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order WITHDRAWING #9 Motion for Entry of Default entered by Judge Robert Pitman. In light of Plaintiff's request at Dkt. 10, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's entry-of-default request against Defendants Bottom Line Restaurants, Inc., and Temple-1941, LLC d/b/a IHOP #9 is WITHDRAWN.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (aa2) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #8 Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge Robert Pitman. In light of Plaintiff's lack of opposition, (Dkt. 10), IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk's Office shall file Defendants' answer at Dkt. 8.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (aa2) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Casey Charanza, re #9 MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendants Bottom Line Restaurants, Inc., and Temple-1941, LLC d/b/a IHOP filed by Plaintiff Casey Charanza, #8 MOTION for Leave to File Answer filed by Defendant Temple-1941, Defendant Bottom Line Restaurants, Inc. (Shields, Joel) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WITHDRAWN PER TEXT ORDER MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendants Bottom Line Restaurants, Inc., and Temple-1941, LLC d/b/a IHOP by Casey Charanza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh.A-ROS_Bottom_Line_Restaurants, #2 Exhibit Exh.B-ROS_IHOP)(Shields, Joel) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to File Answer by Bottom Line Restaurants, Inc., Temple-1941. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Answer, #2 Proposed Order)(Wallace, Jay) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER that Plaintiff shall move for clerk's entry of default against Defendants or file a report apprising the Court of the status of this case on or before August 19, 2020. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Casey Charanza. Temple-1941 served on 7/14/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (Shields, Joel) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Casey Charanza. Bottom Line Restaurants, Inc. served on 7/14/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (Shields, Joel) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Bottom Line Restaurants, Inc., Temple-1941. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Temple-1941, LLC)(dl) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Casey Charanza. (dl) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane. (dl) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Casey Charanza. (Shields, Joel) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/2/2020 to flatten image) (dl). (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Casey Charanza. (Shields, Joel) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/2/2020 to flatten image) (dl). (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13720800), filed by Casey Charanza. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shields, Joel) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jay M Wallace