This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/13/2022 at 07:46:43 (UTC).

Charania v. Wal-Mart

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 Charania filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sean D. Jordan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00023

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sean D. Jordan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Munira Charania

Defendant

Wal-Mart

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael MacMunn Burke

Attorney at Thomas J Henry Law

521 Starr

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Defendant Attorneys

Stacy Hoffman Bruce

Attorney at Cobb, Martinez, Woodward, PLLC - Dallas

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 3100

Dallas, TX 75201

Daniel Anthony Ortega

Attorney at Cobb, Martinez, Woodward, PLLC - Dallas

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 3100

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart from 362nd District Court, Denton County, case number 21-10697-362. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8744009), filed by Wal-Mart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A index, #2 Exhibit B state docket, #3 Exhibit C state pldgs, #4 Exhibit D party info, #5 Exhibit E discl stmt, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bruce, Stacy) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A index

1 #2

Exhibit B state docket

1 #3

Exhibit C state pldgs

1 #4

Exhibit D party info

1 #5

Exhibit E discl stmt

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart, filed by Munira Charania.(rpc, ) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#3

(#3) ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Wal-Mart.(rpc, ) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 1/14/2022. (mcg) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#5

(#5) ***FILING ERROR - ATTORNEY TO REFILE - PLEASE IGNORE*** MOTION for Leave to Appear Motion of Appearance of Counsel by Munira Charania. (Burke, Michael) Modified on 2/22/2022 (mcg, ). (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#6

(#6) ***FILING ERROR - PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael MacMunn Burke on behalf of Munira Charania (Burke, Michael) Modified on 2/22/2022 (mcg, ). (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#7

(#7) AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Wal-Mart. (Ortega, Daniel) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/8/2022. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 4/27/2022 at 11:00 AM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before District Judge Sean D. Jordan. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 3/3/2022. (mcg) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/8/2022. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 4/27/2022 at 11:00 AM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before District Judge Sean D. Jordan. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 3/3/2022. (mcg) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Wal-Mart. (Ortega, Daniel) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Deficiency regarding #5 and #6 Notice of Appearance: INCORRECT DOCKET EVENT. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY. (mcg) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ***FILING ERROR - PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael MacMunn Burke on behalf of Munira Charania (Burke, Michael) Modified on 2/22/2022 (mcg, ). (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ***FILING ERROR - ATTORNEY TO REFILE - PLEASE IGNORE*** MOTION for Leave to Appear Motion of Appearance of Counsel by Munira Charania. (Burke, Michael) Modified on 2/22/2022 (mcg, ). (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 1/14/2022. (mcg) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Wal-Mart.(rpc, ) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart, filed by Munira Charania.(rpc, ) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketNotified Plaintiff's Attorney, Michael Burke, Per GO 04-12, this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. ***ATTORNEY NOT ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN OUR COURT ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER SENT VIA EMAIL*** (rpc, ) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, ) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (rpc, ) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart from 362nd District Court, Denton County, case number 21-10697-362. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8744009), filed by Wal-Mart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A index, #2 Exhibit B state docket, #3 Exhibit C state pldgs, #4 Exhibit D party info, #5 Exhibit E discl stmt, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bruce, Stacy) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stacy Hoffman Bruce