This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/23/2022 at 08:10:27 (UTC).

Chapter 4 Corp. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 02/22/2022 Chapter 4 Corp filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven C. Seeger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00933

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven C. Seeger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chapter 4 Corp.

Defendant

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Thomas Joseph Juettner

Attorney at Greer, Burns, & Crain Ltd

300 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Allyson M. Martin

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Plaintiff's motion for extension of the TRO (Dckt. No. #29 ) is hereby granted. The Court extends the TRO until 5:00 p.m. on May 6, 2022. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

29 #1

Declaration of Allyson M. Martin

#29

(#29) MOTION by Plaintiff Chapter 4 Corp. for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allyson M. Martin)(Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#28

(#28) SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 123,000.00 posted by Chapter 4 Corp. (ph, ) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#27

(#27) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Chapter 4 Corp. by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#26

RESTRICTED

#25

(#25) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Plaintiff's motion to seal (Dckt. No. #3 ) is hereby granted. Plaintiff's motion for electronic service of process (Dckt. No. #19 ) is hereby granted. Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order (Dckt. No. #14 ) is hereby granted. Temporary restraining order to follow. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#19

(#25) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Plaintiff's motion to seal (Dckt. No. #3 ) is hereby granted. Plaintiff's motion for electronic service of process (Dckt. No. #19 ) is hereby granted. Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order (Dckt. No. #14 ) is hereby granted. Temporary restraining order to follow. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#14

(#25) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Plaintiff's motion to seal (Dckt. No. #3 ) is hereby granted. Plaintiff's motion for electronic service of process (Dckt. No. #19 ) is hereby granted. Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order (Dckt. No. #14 ) is hereby granted. Temporary restraining order to follow. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#2) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Chapter 4 Corp. Schedule A regarding complaint, #1 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" (jk2, ) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Plaintiff's motion for extension of the TRO (Dckt. No. #29 ) is hereby granted. The Court extends the TRO until 5:00 p.m. on May 6, 2022. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MOTION by Plaintiff Chapter 4 Corp. for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allyson M. Martin)(Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 123,000.00 posted by Chapter 4 Corp. (ph, ) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Chapter 4 Corp. by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) SEALED TEMPORARY Restraining Order Signed by the Honorable Steven C. Seeger on 4/8/2022. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Plaintiff's motion to seal (Dckt. No. #3 ) is hereby granted. Plaintiff's motion for electronic service of process (Dckt. No. #19 ) is hereby granted. Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order (Dckt. No. #14 ) is hereby granted. Temporary restraining order to follow. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The motion to withdraw as counsel (Dckt. No. #23 ) is hereby granted. Attorney Abby Marie Neu is terminated as counsel of record. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION by Attorney Abby M. Neu to withdraw as attorney for Chapter 4 Corp.. No party information provided (Juettner, Thomas) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Chapter 4 Corp. Exhibit 8 regarding declaration #17 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Chapter 4 Corp. by Thomas Joseph Juettner (Juettner, Thomas) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Chapter 4 Corp. by Abby Marie Neu (Neu, Abby) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Chapter 4 Corp. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Chapter 4 Corp. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Chapter 4 Corp. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Chapter 4 Corp. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION by Plaintiff Chapter 4 Corp. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Chapter 4 Corp. Schedule A regarding complaint, #1 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Chapter 4 Corp.; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19177119. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chapter 4 Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas Joseph Juettner