This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/14/2022 at 09:09:01 (UTC).

Chappell v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 Chappell filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy Totenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00159

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amy Totenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shaun Chappell

Atlanta, GA 30316

Defendant

Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Brent J. Kaplan

Attorney at Isenberg & Hewitt, P.C.

600 Embassy Row, Suite 150

Atlanta, GA 30328

Hilary Wayne Hunter

Attorney at Isenberg & Hewitt, P.C.

600 Embassy Row, Suite 150

Atlanta, GA 30328

Mary T. Minter

Attorney at Isenberg & Hewitt

6600 Peachtree Dunwoody Road, 600 Embassy Row

Atlanta, GA 30328

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation. Discovery ends on 6/13/2022.(lwb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/14/2022)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation identifying Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc. for Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation. (lwb) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Remand to Superior Court of Fulton County by Shaun Chappell. (adg) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#6

(#6) Amended MOTION to Remand to State Court by Shaun Chappell. (vs) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#7

(#7) Amended MOTION to Remand to State Court by Shaun Chappell. (vs) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Amended Motion to Remand by Shaun Chappell.(vs) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court, #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court, #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation. (Minter, Mary) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

#10

(#10) Standing Order: Guidelines to Parties and Counsel in Cases Proceeding Before the Honorable Amy Totenberg. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 2/2/2022. (abm) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE of Compliance by Shaun Chappell (vs) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Hunter, Hilary) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Hunter, Hilary) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court, #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court, to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (hfm) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE of Compliance by Shaun Chappell (vs) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Shaun Chappell re #10 Order. (abm) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Standing Order: Guidelines to Parties and Counsel in Cases Proceeding Before the Honorable Amy Totenberg. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 2/2/2022. (abm) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court, #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court, #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation. (Minter, Mary) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (hfm) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Amended Motion to Remand by Shaun Chappell.(vs) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Amended MOTION to Remand to State Court by Shaun Chappell. (vs) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Amended MOTION to Remand to State Court by Shaun Chappell. (vs) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Remand to Superior Court of Fulton County by Shaun Chappell. (adg) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation identifying Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc. for Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation. (lwb) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(lwb) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation. Discovery ends on 6/13/2022.(lwb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-11516018) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lwb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brent J. Kaplan(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hilary Wayne Hunter