This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:26:34 (UTC).

Chappell v. Jones et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Chappell filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Jones. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacquelyn D Austin and Timothy M Cain. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-03401

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jacquelyn D Austin

Presiding Judge

Timothy M Cain

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stephanie Chappell

Defendants

Jeremy Eugene Jones

Johnny Mack Brown

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel J Farnsworth, Jr

Attorney at Farnsworth Law Offices LLC

211 Petrigru Street

Greenville, SC 29601

Defendant Attorneys

Charles F Turner, Jr

Attorney at Willson Jones Carter and Baxley PA

872 S Pleasantburg Drive

Greenville, SC 29607

Russell W Harter, Jr

Attorney at Chapman Harter and Harter

Po Box 10224

Greenville, SC 29603

Carly H Davis

Attorney at Chapman Harter and Harter

Po Box 10224

Greenville, SC 29603

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jeremy Eugene Jones.(gpre, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#12

(#12) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/16/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 1/30/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 1/30/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/20/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/23/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/22/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/22/2020, Discovery due by 6/22/2020, Motions due by 8/21/2020, Mediation Due by 7/22/2020. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and trial thirty (30) days following the issuance of a Report and Recommendation on any motion described in paragraph 9 of this Order, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 12/26/2019. (gpre, ) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#8

(#8) AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by Jeremy Eugene Jones. (Turner, Charles) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#10

(#10) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Stephanie Chappell. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Plaintiff LR 26.01 Answers - Certificate of Service)(Farnsworth, Daniel) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Johnny Mack Brown.(Harter, Russell) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenville County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-cp-23-06009. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8812320), filed by Jeremy Eugene Jones. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Service filed in state court, #3 Exhibit Answer filed in state court, #4 Certificate of Service)(gpre, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit Affidavit of Service filed in state court

10 #1

Certificate of Service Plaintiff LR 26.01 Answers - Certificate of Service

#11

(#11) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Johnny Mack Brown.(Harter, Russell) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit Answer filed in state court

1 #4

Certificate of Service

1 #1

State Court Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/16/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 1/30/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 1/30/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/20/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/23/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/22/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/22/2020, Discovery due by 6/22/2020, Motions due by 8/21/2020, Mediation Due by 7/22/2020. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and trial thirty (30) days following the issuance of a Report and Recommendation on any motion described in paragraph 9 of this Order, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 12/26/2019. (gpre, ) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Johnny Mack Brown.(Harter, Russell) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Stephanie Chappell. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Plaintiff LR 26.01 Answers - Certificate of Service)(Farnsworth, Daniel) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by Jeremy Eugene Jones. (Turner, Charles) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Johnny Mack Brown.(Harter, Russell) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: Plaintiff's answers to Local Rule 26.01 interrogatories are due no later than 14 days after service of Notice of Removal. (gpre, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jeremy Eugene Jones.(gpre, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenville County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-cp-23-06009. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8812320), filed by Jeremy Eugene Jones. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Service filed in state court, #3 Exhibit Answer filed in state court, #4 Certificate of Service)(gpre, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.