This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/26/2021 at 12:26:06 (UTC).

Chapman v. Wal-Mart, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 Chapman filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Wal-Mart, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael F. Urbanski, Joel C. Hoppe and Thomas T. Cullen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00105

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joel C. Hoppe

Presiding Judges

Michael F. Urbanski

Thomas T. Cullen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stephanie Chapman

Defendant

Wal-Mart, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicholas Wyckoff Woodfield

Attorney at The Employment Law Group PC

888 17Th Street, N.W., Suite 900

Washington, DC 20006

Robert Scott Oswald

Attorney at The Employment Law Group PC

888 17Th Street, N.W., Suite 900

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant Attorneys

Gilda Bethany Ingle

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

1650 Tysons Boulevard, Suite 700

Mclean, VA 22102

Stacey T. Bradford

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

420 20Th Street North, Suite 2300

Birmingham, AL 35203-3204

Scott Alan Forman

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

333 S.E. 2Nd Avenue, Suite 2700

Miami, FL 33131

Charlotte K. Main

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

3424 Peachtree Road, N.E., Ste 1200

Atlanta, GA 30326

 

Court Documents

#1

#3

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#4

4 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Lisa Riley

4 #2

Exhibit Deposition of Clinton Miller

4 #3

Exhibit Deposition of Stephanie Chapman

4 #4

Exhibit Plaintiff's Objections and Answers to Defendant's First Set of

4 #5

Exhibit Deposition of Kim Petry

#7

#8

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2021
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Jury Trial set for 7/14/2021-7/16/2021 at 09:30 AM in Harrisonburg before Judge Thomas T. Cullen. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (ck)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 7/14/2021 - 7/16/2021 09:30 AM in Harrisonburg before Judge Thomas T. Cullen. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs.. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 2/12/2021. (jv)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #3 MOTION for Summary Judgment : (CR) (No Interpreter requested) (#Click on this link for guidance for participation via Zoom and #Click on this link for instructions on how to listen to public hearings) Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2021 09:30 AM via Zoom before Judge Thomas T. Cullen. Zoom instructions emailed to counsel.(ck)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • Docket(#9) Oral ORDER: As discussed during the hearing on 2/2/2021, each Plaintiff's response to defendant's respective motion for summary judgment is due not later than March 10, 2021. Defendant's reply brief is due not later than March 31, 2021. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 2/2/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(kld) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe: Discovery Hearing held on 2/2/2021. (AT&T Conference Manager: Karen Dotson) (kld)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Log Notes for discovery hrg in the Harrisonburg Division held before Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 2/2/21. In accordance with 28 USC 753(b), I certify that I monitored the digital recording of this proceeding and that it is a true and correct record, that it is sufficiently intelligible when played on the FTR (For the Record) Player, and that it can be transcribed without undue difficulty. AT&T Conf Manager: Karen Dotson (kld)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: (FTR) Discovery Hearing set for 2/2/2021 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Clerk emailed dial in information to counsel.(kld)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • Docket(#5) Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (jv)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Brief / Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Lisa Riley, #2 Exhibit Deposition of Clinton Miller, #3 Exhibit Deposition of Stephanie Chapman, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Objections and Answers to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories, #5 Exhibit Deposition of Kim Petry)(Ingle, Gilda)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ingle, Gilda)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docket(#2) Oral ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Thomas T. Cullen for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski no longer assigned to case. Entered by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 1/12/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(jv)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ORDER on motion to sever. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 12/28/2020. (jv)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas Wyckoff Woodfield

Latest cases represented by Lawyer R Scott Oswald