This case was last updated from PACER on 01/14/2020 at 09:24:29 (UTC).

Chapman v. Target Corporation

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 Chapman filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Target Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael E. Hegarty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03240

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael E. Hegarty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deborah Chapman

Bailey, CO 80421

Defendant

Target Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen A. Justino

Attorney at Boesen Law LLC

4100 East Mississippi Avenue, Suite 1900

Denver, CO 80246

Defendant Attorneys

John Roland Chase

Attorney at Montgomery Amatuzio Chase Bell Jones LLP-Denver

4100 E. Mississippi Avenue, Mountain Towers, Suite 1600

Denver, CO 80246-3048

Christy Noelle Redmond

Attorney at Montgomery Amatuzio Chase Bell Jones LLP-Denver

4100 E. Mississippi Avenue, Mountain Towers, Suite 1600

Denver, CO 80246-3048

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Exhibit C to Notice of Removal (Guest Incident Report)

1 #2

Exhibit B to Notice of Removal (State Court Civil Cover Sheet)

1 #5

Exhibit E to Notice of Removal (Target SOS Summary)

1 #4

Exhibit D to Notice of Removal (DMV)

1 #7

Exhibit G to Notice of Removal (State Court Summons)

1 #6

Exhibit F to Notice of Removal (State Court AOS)

1 #8

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Target Corporation from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2019cv31881. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6998823), filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal (State Court Civil Cover Sheet), #3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal (Guest Incident Report), #4 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal (DMV), #5 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal (Target SOS Summary), #6 Exhibit F to Notice of Removal (State Court AOS), #7 Exhibit G to Notice of Removal (State Court Summons), #8 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Chase, John) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#20

(#20) COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 1/13/2020. Discovery Deadline: September 30, 2020. Dispositive Motion Deadline: October 30, 2020. Initial Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures: June 30, 2020. Rebuttal Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures: July 30, 2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2021 01:15 PM in Courtroom A1002 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: A1002. (cthom, ) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Stephen A. Justino by Stephen A. Justino on behalf of Deborah Chapman (Justino, Stephen) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#18

(#18) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Deborah Chapman. (Justino, Stephen) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#16

(#16) ORDER OF REFERENCE Upon Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/31/2019. This case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-03240-MEH. (sphil, ) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

#15

(#15) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Deborah Chapman All parties consent.. (Justino, Stephen) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#14

(#14) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/21/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/23/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 1/13/2020 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #7 Complaint by Target Corporation.(Chase, John) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#7

(#13) ANSWER to #7 Complaint by Target Corporation.(Chase, John) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#11

(#11) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-3240-PAB (angar, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 1/13/2020. Discovery Deadline: September 30, 2020. Dispositive Motion Deadline: October 30, 2020. Initial Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures: June 30, 2020. Rebuttal Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures: July 30, 2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2021 01:15 PM in Courtroom A1002 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: A1002. (cthom, ) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Stephen A. Justino by Stephen A. Justino on behalf of Deborah Chapman (Justino, Stephen) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Deborah Chapman. (Justino, Stephen) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • (#17) ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a), Stephen A. Justino was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll and barred from filing electronically under CM/ECF for failing to pay the 2018 Biennial Fee. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. Upon reinstatement, counsel must file a Notice of Entry of Appearance in this case. (Text Only Entry) (kmont) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER OF REFERENCE Upon Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/31/2019. This case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-03240-MEH. (sphil, ) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Deborah Chapman All parties consent.. (Justino, Stephen) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/21/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/23/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 1/13/2020 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to #7 Complaint by Target Corporation.(Chase, John) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • (#12) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/20/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-3240-PAB (angar, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stephen A. Justino on behalf of Deborah ChapmanAttorney Stephen A. Justino added to party Deborah Chapman(pty:pla) (Justino, Stephen) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rsams, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint and Jury Demand upon Target Corporation on 10/16/2019. (rsams, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Target Corporation, filed by Deborah Chapman.(rsams, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • (#6) Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rsams, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • (#5) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (rsams, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christy Noelle Redmond on behalf of Target CorporationAttorney Christy Noelle Redmond added to party Target Corporation(pty:dft) (Redmond, Christy) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Chase, John) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant Target Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Ntc to USDC of State Court Docket)(Chase, John) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Target Corporation from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2019cv31881. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6998823), filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal (State Court Civil Cover Sheet), #3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal (Guest Incident Report), #4 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal (DMV), #5 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal (Target SOS Summary), #6 Exhibit F to Notice of Removal (State Court AOS), #7 Exhibit G to Notice of Removal (State Court Summons), #8 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Chase, John) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.