This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/15/2022 at 07:29:30 (UTC).

Chapman v. McKesson Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 Chapman filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against McKesson Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-OP-45132

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas Wayne Chapman

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

Cardinal Health Inc.

AmerisourceBergen Corporation

Anda Inc.

Henry Schein Inc.

Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.

TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Cephalon, Inc.

Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (fka Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. fka Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.

Noramco, Inc.

Endo Health Solutions, Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc. (fka Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc.)

Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (nka Actavis, Inc.)

Actavis LLC

Actavis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (fka Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.)

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James G. Onder

Attorney at Onder Shelton O'Leary & Peterson

Second Floor, 110 East Lockwood

St. Louis, MO 63119

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Thomas Chapman as to Actavis LLC filed on behalf of Thomas Chapman (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#3

(#3) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Thomas Chapman as to Depomed, Inc. filed on behalf of Thomas Chapman (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#4

(#4) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Thomas Chapman as to Cardinal Health, Inc. filed on behalf of Thomas Chapman (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#5

(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Thomas Chapman as to Cephalon, Inc. filed on behalf of Thomas Chapman (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#6

(#6) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Thomas Chapman as to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. filed on behalf of Thomas Chapman (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#7

(#7) Waiver of Service Returned Executed as to Noramco, Inc. filed on behalf of Thomas Chapman (Onder, James) . (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#8

(#8) Waiver of Service Returned Executed as to AmerisourceBergen Corporation filed on behalf of Thomas Chapman (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#9

(#9) Waiver of Service Returned Executed as to Henry Schein, Inc. filed on behalf of Thomas Chapman (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#10

(#10) Waiver of Service Returned Executed as to Endo Health Solutions Inc. filed on behalf of Thomas Chapman (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#11

(#11) Waiver of Service Returned Executed as to Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed on behalf of Thomas Chapman (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#12

(#12) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Thomas Chapman. filed on behalf of Thomas Chapman (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#13

(#13) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Thomas Chapman. filed on behalf of Thomas Chapman (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#14

(#14) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Thomas Chapman. filed on behalf of Thomas Chapman (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Thomas Chapman. filed on behalf of Thomas Chapman (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Thomas Chapman. filed on behalf of Thomas Chapman (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Thomas Chapman. filed on behalf of Thomas Chapman (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Waiver of Service Returned Executed as to Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed on behalf of Thomas Chapman (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Waiver of Service Returned Executed as to Endo Health Solutions Inc. filed on behalf of Thomas Chapman (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Waiver of Service Returned Executed as to Henry Schein, Inc. filed on behalf of Thomas Chapman (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Waiver of Service Returned Executed as to AmerisourceBergen Corporation filed on behalf of Thomas Chapman (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Waiver of Service Returned Executed as to Noramco, Inc. filed on behalf of Thomas Chapman (Onder, James) . (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Thomas Chapman as to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. filed on behalf of Thomas Chapman (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Thomas Chapman as to Cephalon, Inc. filed on behalf of Thomas Chapman (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Thomas Chapman as to Cardinal Health, Inc. filed on behalf of Thomas Chapman (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Thomas Chapman as to Depomed, Inc. filed on behalf of Thomas Chapman (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Thomas Chapman as to Actavis LLC filed on behalf of Thomas Chapman (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid. Filed by Thomas Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (P,R) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketRequest to Clerk for refund of erroneous or duplicate on-line filing fee payment. Reason for refund request: double charged. Receipt #: 184208 and 188537, filed by Thomas Chapman. (Onder, James) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Actavis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (fka Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.) is a litigant

Latest cases where Noramco Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Par Pharmaceutical Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Mylan Pharmaceuticals Incorporated is a litigant