This case was last updated from PACER on 11/02/2020 at 09:56:43 (UTC).

CHAPMAN v. FENNEC PHARMACEUTICALS INC. et al

Case Summary

On 09/03/2020 CHAPMAN filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against FENNEC PHARMACEUTICALS INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOE L. WEBSTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00812

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOE L. WEBSTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JIM CHAPMAN

Defendants

Rostislav Raykov

Fennec Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Robert Andrade

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DHAMIAN A. BLUE

Attorney at BLUE STEPHENS & FELLERS

205 Fayetteville St., Ste. 300

Raleigh, NC 27601

PAVITHRA RAJESH

Attorney at GLANCY PRONGAY & MURRAY LLP

1925 Century Park East Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

SAMUEL A. SLATER

Attorney at WYRICK ROBBINS YATES & PONTON LLP

4101 Lake Boone Trail, Ste. 300

Raleigh, NC 27607

LEE MICHAEL WHITMAN

Attorney at WYRICK ROBBINS YATES & PONTON, L.L.P.

Pod 17803

Raleigh, NC 27619

GREGORY L. WATTS

Attorney at WILSON SONSINI GOODRICH & ROSATI

701 Fifth Ave., Ste. 5100

Seattle, WA 98104

BARRY M. KAPLAN

Attorney at WILSON SONSINI GOODRICH & ROSATI

701 Fifth Ave., Ste. 5100

Seattle, WA 98104

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney GREGORY L. WATTS on behalf of Defendants ROBERT ANDRADE, FENNEC PHARMACEUTICALS INC., ROSTISLAV RAYKOV ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-2921749.) (WATTS, GREGORY) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FENNEC PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (WHITMAN, LEE) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

(#8) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by ROBERT ANDRADE, FENNEC PHARMACEUTICALS INC., ROSTISLAV RAYKOV. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WHITMAN, LEE) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney SAMUEL A. SLATER on behalf of Defendants ROBERT ANDRADE, FENNEC PHARMACEUTICALS INC., ROSTISLAV RAYKOV (SLATER, SAMUEL) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney LEE MICHAEL WHITMAN on behalf of Defendants ROBERT ANDRADE, FENNEC PHARMACEUTICALS INC., ROSTISLAV RAYKOV (WHITMAN, LEE) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to FENNEC PHARMACEUTICALS INC. served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (RAJESH, PAVITHRA) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney PAVITHRA RAJESH on behalf of Plaintiff JIM CHAPMAN ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-2911865.) (RAJESH, PAVITHRA) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#3

(#3) Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

2 #2

Summons - Robert Andrade

2 #1

Summons - Rostislav Raykov

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to FENNEC PHARMACEUTICALS INC., ROSTISLAV RAYKOV, ROBERT ANDRADE. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Rostislav Raykov, #2 Summons - Robert Andrade) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

1 #1

Appendix Sworn Certification of Plaintiff

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2885418), filed by JIM CHAPMAN. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Sworn Certification of Plaintiff) (BLUE, DHAMIAN) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney GREGORY L. WATTS on behalf of Defendants ROBERT ANDRADE, FENNEC PHARMACEUTICALS INC., ROSTISLAV RAYKOV ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-2921749.) (WATTS, GREGORY) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney BARRY M. KAPLAN on behalf of Defendants ROBERT ANDRADE, FENNEC PHARMACEUTICALS INC., ROSTISLAV RAYKOV ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-2921741.) (KAPLAN, BARRY) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. For good cause shown, Defendants' obligation to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be deferred until after the Court appoints a lead plaintiff and a consolidated complaint is designated or filed. It is further ORDERED that within fourteen (14) days after the Court's order appointing a lead plaintiff and approving lead counsel, Lead Counsel and counsel for the Defendants shall meet and confer and submit a proposed schedule for the filing of an amended or consolidated complaint and Defendants' response thereto. In light of the foregoing, the requirements of Local Rule 23.1(b) shall be suspended pending further order of the Court. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 10/28/2020.(Lee, Pedra) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice to Parties RE: SO30. Responses due by 11/23/2020 (Winchester, Robin) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions Referred: RE: #8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint , to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (Garrett, Kim) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FENNEC PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (WHITMAN, LEE) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by ROBERT ANDRADE, FENNEC PHARMACEUTICALS INC., ROSTISLAV RAYKOV. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WHITMAN, LEE) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney SAMUEL A. SLATER on behalf of Defendants ROBERT ANDRADE, FENNEC PHARMACEUTICALS INC., ROSTISLAV RAYKOV (SLATER, SAMUEL) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney LEE MICHAEL WHITMAN on behalf of Defendants ROBERT ANDRADE, FENNEC PHARMACEUTICALS INC., ROSTISLAV RAYKOV (WHITMAN, LEE) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to FENNEC PHARMACEUTICALS INC. served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (RAJESH, PAVITHRA) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney PAVITHRA RAJESH on behalf of Plaintiff JIM CHAPMAN ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-2911865.) (RAJESH, PAVITHRA) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to FENNEC PHARMACEUTICALS INC., ROSTISLAV RAYKOV, ROBERT ANDRADE. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Rostislav Raykov, #2 Summons - Robert Andrade) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketCase ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2885418), filed by JIM CHAPMAN. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Sworn Certification of Plaintiff) (BLUE, DHAMIAN) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less