This case was last updated from PACER on 10/01/2021 at 09:04:37 (UTC).

Chapman v. Cook Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 Chapman filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Cook Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sim Lake. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-02491

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sim Lake

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kendal A Chapman

Defendants

Cook Incorporated

Cook Medical Incorporated

Cook Group Incorporated

Cook Medical LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ben C Martin

Attorney at Martin Baughman PLLC

3141 Hood Street, Ste 600

Dallas, TX 75219

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) JPML CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-159) transferring case to Southern District of Indiana to be included in MDL Docket No. 2570. (lgouadi, 4) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

5 #3

Certificate of Service for Cook Medical LLC

5 #2

Certificate of Service for Cook Medical Incorporated

5 #1

Certificate of Service for Cook Incorporated

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of #1 Complaint by Kendal A Chapman, filed. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service for Cook Incorporated, #2 Certificate of Service for Cook Medical Incorporated, #3 Certificate of Service for Cook Medical LLC)(Martin, Ben) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(MelissaMorgan, 4) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/19/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

2 #3

Proposed Summons

2 #2

Proposed Summons

2 #1

Proposed Summons

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Martin, Ben) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26833486) filed by Kendal A Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, Ben) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT of Transfer received via Email Notification : transfer of case to Southern District of Indiana. New Case # assigned: 1:21-cv-06583 and received on 09/01/2021., filed. (BrendaLacy, 4) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketInterdistrict transfer to Southern District of Indiana. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) JPML CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-159) transferring case to Southern District of Indiana to be included in MDL Docket No. 2570. (lgouadi, 4) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of #1 Complaint by Kendal A Chapman, filed. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service for Cook Incorporated, #2 Certificate of Service for Cook Medical Incorporated, #3 Certificate of Service for Cook Medical LLC)(Martin, Ben) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(MelissaMorgan, 4) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/19/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Martin, Ben) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26833486) filed by Kendal A Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, Ben) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COOK GROUP INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where COOK INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where COOK MEDICAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ben C Martin