This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/23/2022 at 08:57:50 (UTC).

Chapman v. Commonwealth of Pennsylvania Department of Health et al

Case Summary

On 05/05/2021 Chapman filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Commonwealth of Pennsylvania Department of Health. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher C. Conner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00824

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christopher C. Conner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lisa Chapman

Defendants

Insight Global, Inc.

Commonwealth of Pennsylvania Department of Health

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Philip P. Dilucente

310 Grant Street, Suite 1801

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

John P. Goodrich

429 Fourth Avenue, Suite 900

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Kenneth Nolan

310 Grant Street, Suite 1801S

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Kevin Laukaitis

134 Kings Highway E2Nd Floor

Haddonfield, NJ 08033

Lauren R. Nichols

Attorney at Goodrich and Associates

429 Fourth Avenuesuite 900

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Phillip Pane DiLucente

Attorney at Phil DiLucente and Associates

310 Grant Streetsuite 1801

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Jonathan Shub

Attorney at Shub Law Firm LLC

134 Kings Highway Eastsecond Floor

Haddonfield, NJ 08033

Kenneth J Nolan

Attorney at Phil DiLucente & Associates, LLC

310 Grant Streetsuite 1801

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

James C. Haggerty

Attorney at Hgsk

1801 Market Streetsuite 100

Philadelphia, PA 19103

John Goodrich

Attorney at Goodrich & Associates, P.C.

429 Fourth Avenuesuite 900

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Scott B. Cooper

Attorney at Schmidt Kramer, P.C.

209 State Street

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Defendant Attorneys

Paul G Karlsgodt

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

1801 California Streetsuite 4400

Denver, CO 80202

Meghan Kelly

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

2929 Arch Streetcira Centre - 12Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19104

Brittany Wilson

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

1735 Market Street51St Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Philip N. Yannella

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

1735 Market Street, 51St Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

43 #1

Certificate of Compliance with Local Rule 7.8 (b)(2)

#43

(#43) REPLY BRIEF re #36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Insight Global, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance with Local Rule 7.8 (b)(2))(Kelly, Meghan) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

42 #1

Certificate of Compliance with Local Rule 7.8(b)(2)

#42

(#42) BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Lisa Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance with Local Rule 7.8(b)(2))(Shub, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

40 #1

Proposed Order

#40

(#40) Unopposed MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation by Lisa Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shub, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

36 #2

Proposed Order

36 #1

Certificate of Nonconcurrence

#36

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Summons Packet

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) REPLY BRIEF re #36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Insight Global, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance with Local Rule 7.8 (b)(2))(Kelly, Meghan) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Lisa Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance with Local Rule 7.8(b)(2))(Shub, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) VERBAL ORDER - It is ORDERED that plaintiff's motion #40 is GRANTED and plaintiff may file a brief in opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss up to 6,500 words. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 10/21/21. (Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the order of the court or notice on the matter.) (spm) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Unopposed MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation by Lisa Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shub, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) VERBAL ORDER It is ORDERED that the stipulation #38 is APPROVED. Plaintiff shall file a response to the motion to dismiss no later than October 25, 2021, and defendant shall have until November 22, 2021, to file any reply brief. (Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the order of the court or notice on the matter.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 9/17/2021. (mw) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Lisa Chapman. (Shub, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Insight Global, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance with Local Rule 7.8 (b)(2))(Kelly, Meghan) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Insight Global, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(Kelly, Meghan) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that defendants motion (Doc. #24 ) to dismiss the complaint (Doc. 1) is DENIED as moot and without prejudice. Defendant shall respond to the amended complaint (Doc. 34) in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 8/27/2021 (mw) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Insight Global, Inc., filed by Lisa Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E)(Shub, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Lauren Nichols. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 5/12/2021. (mw) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorneys and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Scott B. Cooper on behalf of Lisa Chapman Attorney Kenneth Nolan is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5573837., filed by on behalf of Lisa Chapman.(Cooper, Scott) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Scott B. Cooper on behalf of Lisa Chapman Attorney Lauren Nichols is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5573834., filed by on behalf of Lisa Chapman.(Cooper, Scott) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Scott B. Cooper on behalf of Lisa Chapman Attorney Phillip DiLucente is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5573794., filed by on behalf of Lisa Chapman.(Cooper, Scott) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER re Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 5/6/2021. (mw) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been reassigned to Judge Conner. (ao) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketSPECIAL ADMISSION FORM for Kevin Laukaitis, John Goodrich, Lauren Nichols, Philip Dilucente, and Kenneth Nolan can be obtained at http://www.pamd.uscourts.gov/forms/petition-admission-practice. (pjr) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Commonwealth of Pennsylvania Department of Health, Insight Global, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (pjr) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5568420), filed by Lisa Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(pjr) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Insight Global LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth J Nolan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John P. Goodrich

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James C. Haggerty Esq.